EP3866612 - PET FOOD COMPOSITIONS FOR WEIGHT MANAGEMENT IN PETS WITH ADVERSE FOOD REACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mars Incorporated 6885 Elm Street McLean, VA 22101-3885 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/34] | For all designated states Mars Incorporated 6885 Elm Street Mclean, VA 22101-3885 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARZINO, Benedicte 650 Avenue De La Petite Camargue 30470 Aimargues / FR | 02 /
HOURS, Marie-anne 650 Avenue De La Petite Camargue 30470 Aimargues / FR | 03 /
CHARLES, Helene 650 Avenue De La Petite Camargue 30470 Aimargues / FR | 04 /
FILIPPINI, Matthieu 650 Avenue De La Petite Camargue 30470 Aimargues / FR | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/34] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19872575.6 | 17.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019US56678 | Priority number, date | EP20180201322 | 18.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18201322 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020081774 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3866612 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23K10/00, A23K20/147, A23K50/40 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
A23K20/147 (EP,KR,US);
A23J3/346 (KR);
A23K10/20 (EP);
A23K10/30 (EP,KR);
A23K20/158 (KR,US);
A23K20/163 (EP);
A23K50/40 (EP,KR);
A23K50/42 (US);
A23L27/10 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/34] | A23J3/14, A23J3/30, A23K20/147, A23K50/40, A23L33/18, A23L33/185 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | HAUSTIERNAHRUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR GEWICHTSKONTROLLE BEI HAUSTIEREN MIT UNERWÜNSCHTER LEBENSMITTELREAKTION | [2021/34] | English: | PET FOOD COMPOSITIONS FOR WEIGHT MANAGEMENT IN PETS WITH ADVERSE FOOD REACTION | [2021/34] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ALIMENTAIRES POUR ANIMAUX DE COMPAGNIE PERMETTANT LA GESTION DU POIDS CHEZ LES ANIMAUX DE COMPAGNIE DÉVELOPPANT UNE RÉACTION ALIMENTAIRE INDÉSIRABLE | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 06.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4738864 (ERNSTER MICHAEL F [US]); | [I]WO0184950 (IAMS COMPANY [US]); | [A]US2007110880 (THOMAS CARLA R [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US7067147 (HAYEK MICHAEL G [US], et al); | [Y]US8252315 (DIERKING MARK [US], et al); |