EP3851854 - BIOMATERIAL-DETECTING MICROPARTICLE AND BIOMATERIAL DETECTION METHOD USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ezdiatech Inc. 301ho, 119, Dandae-ro Dongnam-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do 31116 / KR | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Young-Gyun 62-9, Bonghwasan-ro 3-gil Jungnang-gu Seoul 02015 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Juu-Ho 201-303, 21, Jungbu-daero 746beon-gil, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17077 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Wook 5206-2603, 65, Edu town-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16509 / KR | 04 /
SONG, Suk-Heung 104-303, 7, Yonggu-daero 2152beon-gil, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16964 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Gyu Dong 255-12, Gwanyang-ro Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 13951 / KR | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19873407.1 | 16.10.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019KR13613 | Priority number, date | KR20180123484 | 17.10.2018 Original published format: KR 20180123484 | [2021/29] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020080833 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851854 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/553, G01N33/58 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
G01N33/5434 (EP);
G01N33/54333 (KR);
G01N33/54326 (US);
G01N21/6428 (EP);
G01N33/54346 (US);
G01N33/54353 (KR);
G01N33/553 (KR,US);
G01N33/581 (KR,US);
G01N33/582 (KR,US);
B82Y25/00 (US);
B82Y30/00 (US);
B82Y35/00 (US);
B82Y40/00 (US);
B82Y5/00 (US);
G01N2021/6439 (EP);
G01N31/22 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | BIOMATERIALDETEKTIONSMIKROPARTIKEL UND BIOMATERIALDETEKTIONSVERFAHREN DAMIT | [2021/29] | English: | BIOMATERIAL-DETECTING MICROPARTICLE AND BIOMATERIAL DETECTION METHOD USING SAME | [2021/29] | French: | MICROPARTICULE DE DÉTECTION DE BIOMATÉRIAU ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE BIOMATÉRIAU L'UTILISANT | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2021 | Translation filed | 16.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 15.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2005101464 (DEMODULATION INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10-14 * page 19, line 13 - line 15; examples 1-7 * [Y] 6,7,9,15; | [XY]WO2008116093 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10-14 * page 17, line 7 - page 19, line 4; example 1 * [Y] 6,7,9,15; | [XY] - SPINELLI I M, "PCR within powdered porous glass: Potential application for glass-coated amorphous metal microwires", THESIS, ALFRED UNIVERSITY, NEW YORK, (20040701), pages 1 - 60, XP002509896 [X] 1,3-5,8,10-14 * page 1 - page 2 * [Y] 6,7,9,15 | International search | [A]KR100759716B (UNIV IND & ACAD COLLABORATION [KR]) [A] 1-20* See the entire document. *; | [A]KR20110105210 (NAT UNIV GYEONGSANG IACF [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *; | [A]CN102323412 (HEFEI INST PHYSICAL SCI CAS) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *; | [X]KR20140055563 (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]) [X] 1-15 * See claims 1-8. *; | [X]KR20140094035 (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]) [X] 1-20 * See abstract; claims 1-3; and figure 1. *; | [A]KR101484743B (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. * | by applicant | KR20180130436 | - "Modem magnetic immunoassay: Biophysical and biochemical aspects", Regul. Mech. Biosyst., (20170000), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 47 - 55 |