EP3867890 - ELECTRONICALLY CONTROLLED MOTOR-DRIVEN DEVICE WITH VIBRATIONAL ACOUSTIC ALERT CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flowserve Management Company 5215 North O'Connor Boulevard, Suite 2300 Irving, TX 75039 / US | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLLANDER, Mark D. Flowserve Management Company 5215 N. O' Connor Blvd., Suite 2300 Irving, Texas 75039 / US | 02 /
CARLSON, Daniel E. Flowserve Management Company 5215 N. O' Connor Blvd., Suite 2300 Irving, Texas 75039 / US | 03 /
RUMORE, Michael Adam Flowserve Management Company 5215 N. O' Connor Blvd., Suite 2300 Irving, Texas 75039 / US | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 19873509.4 | 08.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019US55203 | Priority number, date | US201816165049 | 19.10.2018 Original published format: US201816165049 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020081290 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3867890 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3867890 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/18, H02P25/032, F16K31/04, G05B23/02 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
G08B3/10 (EP,US);
G08B21/18 (KR);
F16K31/04 (KR);
G01R31/343 (US);
G05B23/027 (EP);
H02P25/032 (KR);
H02P29/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/34] | G08B21/18, H02P25/032, F16K31/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCH GESTEUERTE, MOTORBETRIEBENE VORRICHTUNG MIT FÄHIGKEIT FÜR AKUSTISCHEN VIBRATIONSALARM | [2021/34] | English: | ELECTRONICALLY CONTROLLED MOTOR-DRIVEN DEVICE WITH VIBRATIONAL ACOUSTIC ALERT CAPABILITY | [2021/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF À MOTEUR À COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE DOUÉ D'UNE CAPACITÉ D'ALERTE ACOUSTIQUE VIBRATOIRE | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 23.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.12.2022 | CZ | 07.12.2022 | DK | 07.12.2022 | EE | 07.12.2022 | ES | 07.12.2022 | FI | 07.12.2022 | HR | 07.12.2022 | LT | 07.12.2022 | LV | 07.12.2022 | MC | 07.12.2022 | NL | 07.12.2022 | PL | 07.12.2022 | RO | 07.12.2022 | RS | 07.12.2022 | SE | 07.12.2022 | SI | 07.12.2022 | SK | 07.12.2022 | SM | 07.12.2022 | NO | 07.03.2023 | GR | 08.03.2023 | IS | 07.04.2023 | PT | 10.04.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
DK | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 07.12.2022 | |
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RO | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 07.12.2022 | |
ES | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
NL | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
HR | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
PL | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
NO | 07.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 07.12.2022 | |
NO | 07.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009284206 (WENDE THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0011] - [0030]; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2016014430 (REGAL BELOIT AMERICA INC [US]) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0015] - [0031]; figures 2-4 *; | [X]EP3142248 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,11* paragraphs [0007] - [0125]; figures 1-2, 7 * | International search | [Y]US2004203503 (ROLLINS THOMAS JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,12-16; | [Y]US2008278341 (CHIU TSUNG-JE [TW], et al) [Y] 1-5,12-16; | [A]US2011279261 (GAUGER DEREK K [CA], et al) [A] 1-5,12-16; | [A]JP2014123789 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-5,12-16; | [A]US2015226805 (ALBERS TIMOTHY R [US], et al)[A] 1-5,12-16 | by applicant | WO2016014430 |