EP3837724 - MULTIPLE STEP EDGE JOSEPHSON JUNCTION DEVICE AND FABRICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/25] | MULTIPLE STEP EDGE FABRICATION | ||
[2024/04] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Clunies Ross Street Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAZAR, Jeina c/- Clunies Ross St Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | 02 /
PURCHES, Wendy c/- Clunies Ross St Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | 03 /
MITCHELL, Emma c/- Clunies Ross St Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | 04 /
LEWIS, Chris c/- Clunies Ross St Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Black, Diego Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Black, Diego Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19873717.3 | 18.10.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019AU51139 | Priority number, date | AU20180903963 | 19.10.2018 Original published format: AU 2018903963 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020077416 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3837724 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H10N60/01, H10N60/12, H10N69/00, G01R33/035 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
G01R33/0354 (EP,AU,KR,US);
H10N60/0941 (EP,AU,KR);
H10N60/0912 (AU,US);
H10N60/0884 (AU,US);
H10N60/12 (AU,US);
H10N60/124 (EP,AU,KR);
H10N69/00 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | H01L39/24, H01L39/22, H01L27/18, G01R33/035 | ||
Former IPC [2021/25] | H01L39/24, H01L39/22, G01R33/035 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | BAUELEMENT MIT MEHRFACHSTUFENKANTEN-JOSEPHSONÜBERGÄNGEN UND HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2024/29] | English: | MULTIPLE STEP EDGE JOSEPHSON JUNCTION DEVICE AND FABRICATION THEREOF | [2024/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF À JONCTIONS JOSEPHSON À BORDS ÉCHELONNÉS MULTIPLES ET SA FABRICATION | [2024/04] |
Former [2021/25] | MEHRSTUFIGE KANTENFERTIGUNG | ||
Former [2021/25] | MULTIPLE STEP EDGE FABRICATION | ||
Former [2021/25] | FABRICATIONS DE PLUSIEURS COINS ÉCHELONNÉS | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 08.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4719498 (WADA OSAMU [JP], et al); | [A]US5444007 (TSUCHIAKI MASAKATSU [US]); | [A]US5498881 (FUJIMOTO MANABU [JP], et al); | [A]US5550101 (NAGATA MASAYA [JP], et al); | [A]US6423473 (SUNG GUN YONG [KR], et al); | [A]US6690162 (SCHOPOHL NILS [DE], et al); | [A]US2004077504 (ADACHI SEIJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2004232405 (HORIBE MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2017109040 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]); | [X]JP2018125358 (FUJITSU LTD) |