EP3855663 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNALS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Jinkyu 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Taehyoung 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Youngbum 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
OH, Jinyoung 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, Seunghoon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19873765.2 | 14.10.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019KR13429 | Priority number, date | KR20180125419 | 19.10.2018 Original published format: KR 20180125419 | [2021/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020080768 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3855663 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3855663 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/1829, H04L5/00, // H04L27/26, H04W72/20 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H04L5/0026 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (EP,KR);
H04W72/21 (KR,US);
H04L1/1819 (US);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (US);
H04L5/0005 (KR,US);
H04L5/0035 (EP);
H04L5/005 (KR);
H04L5/0064 (EP);
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04L27/2602 (EP);
H04L5/0012 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | H04L5/00, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON SIGNALEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2021/30] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING SIGNALS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2021/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAUX DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2021 | Translation filed | 22.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 17.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | MC | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | LU | 14.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
DK | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
MC | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
LU | 14.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
DK | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
MC | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
LU | 14.10.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
MC | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
LU | 14.10.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
LU | 14.10.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2018167933 (YIN ZHANPING [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 13A-C, 14A-B * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0115] *; | [A]WO2018151434 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0070] *; | EP3585021 [ ] (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [ ] * paragraph [0049] *; | [A] - SPREADTRUM COMMUNICATIONS, "Considerations on NOMA procedures", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180520), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1806405 CONSIDERATIONS ON NOMA PROCEDURES_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20180520), XP051441609 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]KR20130081218 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-15; | [A]WO2018064582 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [A] 1-15; | WO2018064582 [ ] (INTEL IP CORP [US]); | [A]WO2018128200 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15; | [Y] - ZTE, "Summary of AI 7.2.1.3 on procedures for NOMA", Rl-1809788, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #94, Gothenburg, Sweden, (20180815), XP051517147 [Y] 1-15 | [Y] - NOKIA, "Procedures to be considered for NOMA operation", Rl-1811103, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #94bis Chengdu, (20180928), XP051518505 [Y] 2, 4, 9, 11, 15 |