EP3867070 - HIGH STABILITY INK DELIVERY SYSTEMS, AND ASSOCIATED PRINT SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics for Imaging, Inc. 6453 Kaiser Drive Fremont, CA 94555 / US | [2022/21] |
Former [2021/34] | For all designated states Electronics for Imaging, Inc. 6750 Dumbarton Circle Fremont, CA 94555 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESCUDERO GONZALEZ, Juan Pol. Ind. SUPOI-8; C/Dels Ibers, 54 12550 Almazora / ES | 02 /
BUENO ESPINAL, Eduardo Pol. Ind. SUPOI-8; C/Dels Ibers, 54 12550 Almazora / ES | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 19874442.7 | 16.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019US56531 | Priority number, date | US201816162077 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: US201816162077 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020081679 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3867070 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3867070 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J2/18, B41J2/195 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
B41J2/175 (EP);
B41J2/17566 (US);
B41J2/18 (EP);
B41J2/195 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/34] | B41J2/03, B41J2/135, G01D15/16, G01D15/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENABGABESYSTEME MIT HOHER STABILITÄT UND ZUGEHÖRIGE DRUCKSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2021/34] | English: | HIGH STABILITY INK DELIVERY SYSTEMS, AND ASSOCIATED PRINT SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2021/34] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE DISTRIBUTION D'ENCRE À STABILITÉ ÉLEVÉE, ET SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'IMPRESSION ASSOCIÉS | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 29.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013208038 (ISOZAKI JUN [JP], et al) | International search | [Y]WO2010138156 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al); | [Y]US7874656 (OTA NORITAKA [JP], et al); | [YA]US8109596 (KARPPINEN VESA [AU]); | [Y]US8491075 (ZHOU JING [US], et al); | [YA]US8926077 (LACAZE JOHN RANDEL [US], et al); | [Y]US8991986 (SOWINSKI ALLAN FRANCIS [US], et al) |