EP3859561 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING VIDEO FILE, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Peihua Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Xiaodong Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Chengfu Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
HE, Liping Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
LIANG, Haowei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19874549.9 | 14.10.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019CN110921 | Priority number, date | CN201811204663 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: CN201811204663 | [2021/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020078299 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3859561 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/738 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
G06F16/739 (EP);
G06F16/743 (US);
G06F16/732 (US);
G06F16/735 (US);
G06F16/7837 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | G06F16/732 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON VIDEODATEIEN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/31] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING VIDEO FILE, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2021/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE TRAITER UN FICHIER VIDÉO ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2021 | Translation filed | 27.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 17.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010006334 (VIDEOSURF INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0054] *; | [XI] - YONG JAE LEE ET AL, "Discovering important people and objects for egocentric video summarization", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR), 2012 IEEE CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120616), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2012.6247820, ISBN 978-1-4673-1226-4, pages 1346 - 1353, XP032232219 [X] 1-3,10-12,15 * page 1346, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 1347, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 1351, column l, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 1350, column l, paragraph 4 - column r, paragraph 2 * [I] 4-9,13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2012.6247820 | [A] - MONEY ET AL, "Video summarisation: A conceptual framework and survey of the state of the art", JOURNAL OF VISUAL COMMUNICATION AND IMAGE REPRESENTATION, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC, US, (20071228), vol. 19, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JVCIR.2007.04.002, ISSN 1047-3203, pages 121 - 143, XP022404518 [A] 1-15 * page 126, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jvcir.2007.04.002 |