EP3842086 - TUBE CONNECTOR, EXTRACORPOREAL CIRCULATION CIRCUIT, AND BLOOD PURIFICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikkiso Co., Ltd. 20-3, Ebisu 4-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-6022 / JP | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUO, Sumiaki c/o NIKKISO CO., LTD., Research & Engineering Institute, 498-1, Shizutani Makinohara-shi Shizuoka 421-0496 / JP | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Forrest, Stuart WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 19875879.9 | 01.08.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019JP30211 | Priority number, date | JP20180198587 | 22.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018198587 | [2021/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020084855 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3842086 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3842086 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, A61M39/10, A61M60/109 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
A61M1/367 (EP);
A61M39/10 (EP,US);
A61M1/267 (US);
A61M5/14228 (EP);
A61M60/109 (EP,US);
A61M60/113 (EP,US);
A61M60/279 (EP,US);
A61M60/37 (EP,US);
A61M60/835 (EP);
A61M60/845 (EP);
A61M1/3627 (US);
A61M1/3643 (EP);
A61M1/3644 (US);
A61M2039/0009 (EP);
A61M2206/10 (EP);
A61M5/36 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/26] | A61M1/36, A61M1/10, A61M1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAUCHVERBINDER, EXTRAKORPORALER KREISLAUF UND BLUTREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/26] | English: | TUBE CONNECTOR, EXTRACORPOREAL CIRCULATION CIRCUIT, AND BLOOD PURIFICATION DEVICE | [2021/26] | French: | RACCORD DE TUBE, CIRCUIT DE CIRCULATION EXTRACORPORELLE ET DISPOSITIF DE PURIFICATION DE SANG | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2021 | Translation filed | 25.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 16.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP3007076U ; | [A]JP2011212174 (TORAY MEDICAL CO LTD) | International search | [A]JP3007076U ; | [A]US2007129705 (TROMBLEY FREDERICK W III [US], et al); | [A]JP2011212174 (TORAY MEDICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2014008376 (NIKKISO CO LTD); | [A]WO2014017604 (ASAHI KASEI MEDICAL CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2011212174 |