EP3854351 - VALVE CUSP SIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ozaki, Shigeyuki 2-9-22, Tairamachi, Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-0032 / JP | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 19876068.8 | 11.10.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019JP40159 | Priority number, date | JP20180200784 | 25.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018200784 | [2021/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020085112 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854351 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
A61F2/2496 (EP,US);
A61F2/76 (EP,US);
G01B3/14 (EP);
A61F2002/762 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | VENTILHÖCKERDIMENSIONIERER | [2021/30] | English: | VALVE CUSP SIZER | [2021/30] | French: | CALIBREUR DE CUSPIDE DE VALVULE | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2021 | Translation filed | 22.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 06.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010249661 (RIGHINI GIOVANNI [IT], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0021] - [0041]; figures 1-6B * [I] 2,4; | [A]EP3192472 (JAPANESE ORGANIZATION FOR MEDICAL DEVICE DEV INC [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0051]; figure 6A * | International search | [A]JP2012517278 (ST. JUDE MEDICAL, INC.) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0021], [0030], fig. 1 & WO 2010/090720 A1, paragraphs [0025], [0034], fig. 1 & US 2012/0071968 A1 *; | [A]WO2016111231 (OZAKI SHIGEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * , paragraph [0028], fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2016039095 (OZAKI SHIGEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0033]-[0034], fig. 1 & US 2017/0281347 A1, paragraphs [0043]-[0044], fig. 1 & EP 3192472 A1 & CA 2956064 A1 & KR 10-2017-0042650 A & CN 106794068 A * | by applicant | JP2009077838 |