EP3873046 - PARAMETER CONFIGURATION AND PARAMETER RECEIVING METHODS AND APPARATUS, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Huahua ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Chuangxin ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LU, Zhaohua ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
LI, Yong ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Shujuan ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19876133.0 | 24.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019CN112929 | Priority number, date | CN201811247396 | 24.10.2018 Original published format: CN201811247396 | [2021/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020083326 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3873046 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04B7/0456, // H04L5/00 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
H04L27/2613 (EP,CN,US);
H04L27/26136 (KR);
H04L27/262 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04B7/0456 (EP);
H04L27/06 (KR);
H04L27/261 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/35] | H04L27/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | PARAMETERKONFIGURATIONS- UND PARAMETEREMPFANGSVERFAHREN UND -GERÄT SOWIE SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/35] | English: | PARAMETER CONFIGURATION AND PARAMETER RECEIVING METHODS AND APPARATUS, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE CONFIGURATION DE PARAMÈTRES ET DE RÉCEPTION DE PARAMÈTRES ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2021 | Translation filed | 25.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 22.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.09.2024 | 05.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |