EP3825600 - LED FLASH LIGHT SOURCE AND RUNWAY EMBEDDED-TYPE FLASH LIGHT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HotaluX, Ltd. 11-11, Shiba 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | [2023/50] |
Former [2021/21] | For all designated states HotaluX, Ltd. 7-17, Shiba 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 1050014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIZOBE Norimasa c/o HotaluX, Ltd., 7-17, Shiba 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | McKinnon, Alistair James WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 19876762.6 | 21.08.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019JP32555 | Priority number, date | JP20180201401 | 26.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018201401 | [2021/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020084881 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3825600 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3825600 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/20, F21V15/04, F21V15/01, F21V5/00, F21V29/70, // F21W111/06, F21V29/51, F21Y115/10, F21Y105/10 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
F21V5/007 (EP,US);
B64F1/205 (EP,US);
F21S10/06 (US);
F21S8/022 (US);
F21V15/01 (EP,US);
F21V15/04 (EP,US);
F21V29/70 (EP,US);
F21V5/02 (US);
B64D2203/00 (EP,US);
F21V29/51 (EP);
F21W2111/06 (EP,US);
F21Y2105/10 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/21] | F21S2/00, B64F1/20, B64F1/36, F21V5/00, F21V8/00, F21V15/01, F21V15/04, F21V29/503, F21V29/51, F21V29/70, F21W111/06, F21Y115/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-BLITZLICHTQUELLEN UND IN EINE START UND LANDEBAHN EINGEBETTETE BLITZLICHTVORRICHTUNG | [2021/21] | English: | LED FLASH LIGHT SOURCE AND RUNWAY EMBEDDED-TYPE FLASH LIGHT DEVICE | [2021/21] | French: | SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE FLASH À DEL ET DISPOSITIF DE LUMIÈRE FLASH DE TYPE INTÉGRÉ À LA PISTE | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2021 | Translation filed | 17.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 06.12.2023 | |
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN202501314U (SHENZHEN K ENERGY IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2018163779 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) | International search | [A]JPS5964399U ; | [A]JP2018055776 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY); | [A]JP2018163779 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) | by applicant | JP2000228103 | JP2018201401 |