EP3870860 - STRUCTURE WITH SELECTIVELY VARIABLE STIFFNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC. 6565 Headquarters Drive W1-3C Plano TX 75024 / US | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANDHI, Umesh N. c/o Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. 6565 Headquarters Drive W1-3C Plano, Texas 75024 / US | 02 /
PROKHOROV, Danil V. c/o Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. 6565 Headquarters Drive W1-3C Plano, Texas 75024 / US | 03 /
ROWE, Michael Paul c/o Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. 6565 Headquarters Drive W1-3C Plano, Texas 75024 / US | 04 /
TSURUTA, Ryohei c/o Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. 6565 Headquarters Drive W1-3C Plano, Texas 75024 / US | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19877086.9 | 15.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019US56225 | Priority number, date | US201816169333 | 24.10.2018 Original published format: US201816169333 | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020086325 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870860 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/06, F15B11/08, F15B13/044, F15B15/26 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
F16F15/027 (EP);
B32B3/30 (US);
B32B25/042 (EP);
B32B25/12 (EP);
B32B25/14 (EP);
B32B25/16 (EP);
B32B25/20 (EP);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/283 (EP);
B32B27/304 (EP);
B32B27/322 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B3/08 (US);
B32B33/00 (EP,US);
B32B7/02 (EP,US);
B32B7/03 (EP,US);
F16F13/08 (EP);
B32B2250/05 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP);
B32B2307/202 (EP);
B32B2307/50 (EP);
B32B2307/51 (EP,US);
B32B2307/536 (US);
B32B2307/546 (EP);
B32B2307/56 (US);
B32B2307/7265 (EP);
B32B2457/00 (EP);
F16F2228/066 (EP);
F16F7/128 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | STRUKTUR MIT SELEKTIV VARIABLER STEIFHEIT | [2021/35] | English: | STRUCTURE WITH SELECTIVELY VARIABLE STIFFNESS | [2021/35] | French: | STRUCTURE À RAIDEUR SÉLECTIVEMENT VARIABLE | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 20.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009052049 (BATCHKO ROBERT G [US], et al); | [A]US2016279803 (LESSING JOSHUA AARON [US], et al); | International search | [A]KR20050056526 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]); | [AX]US2006038745 (NAKSEN ALEX [US], et al); | [A]US7892630 (MCKNIGHT GEOFFREY P [US], et al); | [A]US7901524 (MCKNIGHT GEOFFREY [US], et al); | [A]WO2017077541 (BOGRASH PHILIP [IL]) | by applicant | US2009052049 |