EP3872322 - ENGINE TAIL GAS OZONE PURIFYING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Bixiufu Enterprise Management Co., Ltd. Room 404B, Building 10 No. 1188 Lianhang Road Minhang District Shanghai 201112 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states Shanghai Bixiufu Enterprise Management Co., Ltd. Room 404B Building 10 No. 1188 Lianhang Road Minhang District Shanghai 201112 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Wanfu Room 404B, Building 10, No. 1188, Lianhang Road Minhang District Shanghai 201112 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Daxiang Room 404B, Building 10, No. 1188, Lianhang Road Minhang District Shanghai 201112 / CN | 03 /
XI, Yong Room 404B, Building 10, No. 1188, Lianhang Road Minhang District Shanghai 201112 / CN | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Romano, Giuseppe, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19877091.9 | 21.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019CN112139 | Priority number, date | CN201811227573 | 22.10.2018 Original published format: CN201811227573 | CN201811525874 | 13.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811525874 | CN201811563797 | 20.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811563797 | CN201910211284 | 20.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910211284 | CN201910340445 | 25.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910340445 | CN201910340443 | 25.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910340443 | CN201910418872 | 20.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910418872 | CN201910452169 | 28.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910452169 | CN201910605156 | 05.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910605156 | CN201910636710 | 15.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910636710 | [2021/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020083164 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3872322 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/30, F01N3/22, B03C3/013, C01B13/10, B01D53/32, B01D53/75, B01D53/86, B01D53/92 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
B01D53/323 (EP);
B01D53/346 (US);
B01D53/002 (US);
B01D53/44 (US);
B01D53/56 (US);
B01D53/73 (US);
B01D53/76 (US);
B01D53/8675 (EP);
B01D53/92 (EP,US);
B01D53/922 (US);
B01D53/925 (US);
B03C3/013 (EP);
B03C3/017 (US);
B03C3/0175 (EP);
B03C3/06 (US);
B03C3/41 (US);
B03C3/49 (US);
B03C3/60 (EP);
B03C3/66 (US);
C01B13/10 (EP);
C01B13/11 (US);
F01N11/00 (US);
F01N3/01 (US);
F01N3/22 (EP);
F01N3/2803 (US);
F01N3/30 (EP);
F01N9/00 (US);
B01D2251/104 (EP);
B01D2257/404 (EP,US);
B01D2257/502 (EP);
B01D2257/708 (EP,US);
B01D2258/01 (US);
B01D53/75 (EP);
B03C2201/30 (EP,US);
C01B2201/20 (US);
C01B2201/34 (US);
F01N2240/38 (EP,US);
F01N2370/02 (US);
F01N2560/022 (EP);
F01N2560/026 (EP);
F01N2560/05 (EP);
F01N2900/1402 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/35] | F01N3/08, F01N3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENDGASOZONREINIGUNG EINES MOTORS | [2021/35] | English: | ENGINE TAIL GAS OZONE PURIFYING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2021/35] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION D'OZONE DES GAZ RÉSIDUAIRES DE MOTEUR | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2021 | Translation filed | 19.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 21.03.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10231620 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3,8,10 * paragraphs [0030] , [0 47] , [0 50] ** figures 1, 5 *; | [X]JP2011179461 (TOYOTA IND CORP, et al) [X] 1,3-8,10,12-14 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0014] * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE102016116588 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-11 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0085] * * figures 10,11 * |