EP3699234 - POLYPHENYLENE SULFIDE RESIN COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND INJECTION MOLDED PRODUCT MANUFACTURED FROM SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hyun Jin LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
HAM, Myong Jo LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Soongin LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Eon Seok LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 19877550.4 | 14.11.2019 | [2020/35] | WO2019KR15566 | Priority number, date | KR20180164012 | 18.12.2018 Original published format: KR 20180164012 | [2020/35] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020130365 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3699234 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3699234 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08L81/02, C08K7/14, C08K3/22, C08K5/053, C08K9/06, C08K5/5415, C08K3/013, C08G75/0204, B29B11/10, B29B7/90 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
C08G75/0204 (EP,KR,US);
C08L81/02 (EP,KR,US);
B29B11/10 (EP,KR);
B29B7/90 (EP,KR);
B29C45/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,KR);
C08K3/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/40 (US);
C08K5/053 (EP,KR);
C08K5/53 (US);
C08K5/5415 (EP,KR,US);
C08K7/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08K9/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,KR);
C08K2003/2248 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYPHENYLENSULFIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTES SPRITZGUSSPRODUKT | [2020/35] | English: | POLYPHENYLENE SULFIDE RESIN COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND INJECTION MOLDED PRODUCT MANUFACTURED FROM SAME | [2020/35] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE SULFURE DE POLYPHÉNYLÈNE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE LADITE COMPOSITION, ET PRODUIT MOULÉ PAR INJECTION PRÉPARÉ À PARTIR DE LADITE COMPOSITION | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2020 | Translation filed | 08.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 04.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2019 | AL | 02.03.2022 | AT | 02.03.2022 | CY | 02.03.2022 | CZ | 02.03.2022 | DK | 02.03.2022 | EE | 02.03.2022 | ES | 02.03.2022 | FI | 02.03.2022 | HR | 02.03.2022 | IT | 02.03.2022 | LT | 02.03.2022 | LV | 02.03.2022 | MC | 02.03.2022 | MK | 02.03.2022 | MT | 02.03.2022 | NL | 02.03.2022 | PL | 02.03.2022 | RO | 02.03.2022 | RS | 02.03.2022 | SE | 02.03.2022 | SI | 02.03.2022 | SK | 02.03.2022 | SM | 02.03.2022 | BG | 02.06.2022 | NO | 02.06.2022 | GR | 03.06.2022 | IS | 02.07.2022 | PT | 04.07.2022 | IE | 14.11.2022 | LU | 14.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 14.11.2019 | |
AL | 02.03.2022 | ||
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
MK | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 14.11.2019 | |
AL | 02.03.2022 | ||
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CY | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
MC | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SI | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
DK | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.03.2022 | |
AT | 02.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
IS | 02.07.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SK | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
CZ | 02.03.2022 | ||
EE | 02.03.2022 | ||
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 02.03.2022 | |
ES | 02.03.2022 | ||
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RO | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
SM | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
PT | 04.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
NL | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
FI | 02.03.2022 | ||
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
LV | 02.03.2022 | ||
PL | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
GR | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
HR | 02.03.2022 | ||
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
RS | 02.03.2022 | ||
SE | 02.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.06.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 02.03.2022 | |
LT | 02.03.2022 | ||
NO | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 02.03.2022 | |
NO | 02.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2128200 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0042]; example -; claims 1-8 *; | [X]US2014066560 (STOPPELMANN GEORG [CH], et al) [X] 1-14* paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0138]; example -; claims 1-34 *; | [Y]WO2014042283 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, line 8 - page 27, line 5; example -; claims 1-14 *; | [X]US2014353543 (WU TONG [CN], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0160]; example -; claims 1-40 *; | [X]WO2017017660 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0097]; example -; claims 1-20 *; | [X]WO2018130972 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0101]; example -; claims 1-19 *; | [X]WO2018130970 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0080]; example -; claims 1-20 *; | [X]WO2018178128 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 6 - page 10, line 8; example -; claims 1-14 *; | [Y] - KIHO KIM ET AL, "Laser direct structuring and electroless plating applicable super-engineering plastic PPS based thermal conductive composite with particle surface modification", RSC ADVANCES, (20180101), vol. 8, no. 18, doi:10.1039/C8RA00967H, pages 9933 - 9940, XP055715510 [Y] 1-14 * page 9933 - page 9940 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C8RA00967H | International search | [A]KR20150054770 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0054]-[0057]; claims 1, 12-14. *; | [A]KR20160016957 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0116]-[0118], [0142]-[0144]: claims 1. 3. *; | [A]KR20170099296 (LOTTE ADVANCED MAT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14* See claims 1-11. *; | [XA]WO2018130972 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) [X] 1, 2, 5-14 * See paragraphs [0040], [0052], [0058], [0076], [0077], [0088], [0092], [0094]; claims 1, 2, 5,6,12,14. * [A] 3, 4; | [A]WO2018130970 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0025]-[0027]; claims 1-3. * | by applicant | KR20170024455 | KR20180164012 |