EP3874879 - METHOD AND INTEGRATED ACCESS BACKHAUL NODE FOR RESOURCE SCHEDULING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Min Granitstigen 27 977 53 Lulea / SE | 02 /
LIU, Jinhua No. 5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19877778.1 | 30.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019CN114444 | Priority number, date | WO2018CN112736 | 30.10.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/112736 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020088546 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3874879 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, // H04L1/18, H04W84/04 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
H04W72/12 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L47/28 (EP);
H04L1/18 (EP);
H04W84/047 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BACKHAUL-KNOTEN MIT INTEGRIERTEM ZUGANG ZUR BETRIEBSMITTELPLANUNG | [2021/36] | English: | METHOD AND INTEGRATED ACCESS BACKHAUL NODE FOR RESOURCE SCHEDULING | [2021/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, ET NOEUD IAB (INTEGRATED ACCESS BACKHAUL) POUR LA PLANIFICATION DE RESSOURCES | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI] - NOKIA ET AL, "Resource allocation/coordination between Parent BH and Child links", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chengdu, China; 20181008 - 20181012, (20180928), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1810675_IAB_RESOURCE ALLOCATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F94b/Docs/R1%2D1810675%2Ezip, (20181211), XP051518080 [X] 1-3,6,8,11,12,14,15 * "2 Schedulable resources for IAB child link(s)" - "2.1 NR Rel-15 approach" * * "3 Resource allocation granularity: slot vs. mini-slot" - 4 "Multi-hop support and IAB-node processing times" * * "Appendix" * * figures 1, 2, 4-6 * * table 1 * [A] 7,9,10,13 [I] 4,5 | [XAI] - NOKIA ET AL, "Resource allocation between backhaul and access links", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20180820 - 20180824, (20180810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1808580_IAB_RESOURCE ALLOCATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F94/Docs/R1%2D1808580%2Ezip, (20180810), XP051515957 [X] 1-3,6,8,11,12,14,15 * "1 Introduction" * * "4 Scheduling and resource coordination between backhaul and access" - "5 Multi-hop support and IAB noded processing times" * * figures 5, 6 * * table 1 * [A] 7,9,10,13 [I] 4,5 | [A] - AT&T, "Summary of 7.2.3.1 Enhancements to support NR backhaul links", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20180820 - 20180824, (20180825), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1809941, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F94/Docs/R1%2D1809941%2Ezip, (20181211), XP051517297 [A] 1-15 * "TDM/FDM/SDM access and backhaul traffic multiplexing" * * "3.3 Timing and Synchronization" * |