EP3875183 - JIG FOR METAL PLASTIC WORKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd. 18-1, Higashi-Gotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8627 / JP | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAGAI, Takuho c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Research & Development, 22-4, Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 02 /
OGAWA, Tomohiro c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Research & Development, 22-4, Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 03 /
SHIROISHI, Ryozo c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Research & Development, 22-4, Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 04 /
MATSUMOTO, Naoya c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Research & Development, 22-4, Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | 05 /
SHIMAMURA, Masahiro c/o Toyo Seikan Group Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Research & Development, 22-4, Okazawa-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0062 / JP | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/36] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19878984.4 | 16.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019JP40690 | Priority number, date | JP20180204936 | 31.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018204936 | [2021/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020090475 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875183 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B21D37/01, B21D22/28 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
B21D22/28 (EP,KR,US);
B24B19/20 (KR);
B21D22/22 (KR);
B21D37/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | SPANNVORRICHTUNG FÜR METALLKUNSTSTOFFBEARBEITUNG | [2021/36] | English: | JIG FOR METAL PLASTIC WORKING | [2021/36] | French: | GABARIT DESTINÉ AU TRAVAIL DES MÉTAUX ET DU PLASTIQUE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2021 | Translation filed | 09.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5921131 (STANGE TERRY G [US]) [Y] 4* column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 6 *; | [X]EP2444245 (TOYO KOHAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0017] *; | [X]EP3287544 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] *; | [XY]WO2018079434 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0061]; figure 3 * [Y] 4; | [X]EP3342501 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH06304679 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 1-6 * , *; | [A]JPH10249462 (KISHIMOTO AKIRA) [A] 1-6 * . *; | [A]WO2011125657 (HITACHI TOOL ENG [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* , *; | [Y]JP2018069256 (TOYO SEIKAN GROUP HOLDINGS LTD, et al) [Y] 1-6 * , * | by applicant | JP2783746B | JP4984263B | JP5152836B | WO2017033791 |