EP3875041 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENT HAVING BENDABLE ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ezisurg Medical Co., Ltd. Room 103, Building 2, No. 1690 Cailun Rd. Pilot Free Trade Zone China (Shanghai) Shanghai 200000 / CN | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Chuangang Bldg 1A, 199 Tianxiong Road, Pudong District Shanghai 201318 / CN | 02 /
BAO, Minghui Bldg 1A, 199 Tianxiong Road, Pudong District Shanghai 201318 / CN | 03 /
LIAO, Menghui Bldg 1A, 199 Tianxiong Road, Pudong District Shanghai 201318 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Jun Bldg 1A, 199 Tianxiong Road, Pudong District Shanghai 201318 / CN | 05 /
NIE, Honglin Bldg 1A, 199 Tianxiong Road, Pudong District Shanghai 201318 / CN | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Mansfield, Peter Turquand Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19879967.8 | 01.11.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019CN114934 | Priority number, date | CN201811302987 | 02.11.2018 Original published format: CN201811302987 | [2021/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020088627 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875041 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, // A61B17/00, A61B17/29 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,CN);
A61B17/072 (US);
A61B17/00234 (US);
A61B2017/00296 (US);
A61B2017/00336 (US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07221 (CN);
A61B2017/07271 (US);
A61B2017/07285 (CN,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | A61B17/072 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT MIT BIEGBAREM AKTUATOR | [2021/36] | English: | SURGICAL INSTRUMENT HAVING BENDABLE ACTUATOR | [2021/36] | French: | INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL AYANT UN ACTIONNEUR PLIABLE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2021 | Translation filed | 21.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 06.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2772198 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]); | [X]EP3042617 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY LLC [PR]); | [XA]EP3338660 (ETHICON LLC [PR]) |