EP3876668 - HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMAO, Tsubasa c/o Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19880442.9 | 29.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019JP42403 | Priority number, date | JP20180205492 | 31.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018205492 | [2021/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020090827 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876668 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/06, H05B3/48, F23Q7/22 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
H05B3/48 (EP);
H05B3/06 (EP,US);
F23Q7/10 (US);
F23Q7/22 (EP);
H05B3/44 (US);
H05B2203/027 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | H05B3/06, F23Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | HEIZER | [2021/36] | English: | HEATER | [2021/36] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2021 | Translation filed | 13.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 12.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US6605801 (HAUSSNER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 17; figures 1,4 * [A] 3-7[I] 2; | [XAI]US7351935 (KONISHI MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 2; figures 1,10,14,15 * * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 2 * * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 4 * * column 13, line 4 - column 14, line 7 * [A] 3-7 [I] 2 | International search | [Y]JPS56105119 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-4, 6 * , page 1, lower left column, line 15 to page 3, upper right column, line 10, fig. 1-5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPS56164224 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-4, 6 * , page 1, lower left column, line 12 to page 2, lower right column, line 15, fig. 1-6 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH08170646 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING) [Y] 1-4, 6 * , paragraphs [0015]-[0033], fig. 1-10 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2004251613 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [Y] 1-4, 6 * , paragraph [0016], fig. 1 & US 2004/0178185 A1, paragraph [0028], fig. 1 & EP 1443273 A2 *; | [Y]CN102889305 (NTN SNR ROULEMENTS) [Y] 1-4, 6* , paragraphs [0013]-[0029], fig. 1-2c & EP 2549136 A2 *; | [YA]JP2018120794 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 1-4, 6 * , paragraphs [0011]-[0035], fig. 1-7 (Family: none) * [A] 5, 7 | by applicant | JP2004251613 |