EP3876682 - WIRING BOARD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING WIRING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWA Kenichi c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd., 1-1, Ichigaya- kaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
OKIMOTO Naoko c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd., 1-1, Ichigaya- kaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 03 /
NAGAE Mitsutaka c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd., 1-1, Ichigaya- kaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 04 /
SAKATA Makiko c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd., 1-1, Ichigaya- kaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 05 /
MIYOSHI Toru c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd., 1-1, Ichigaya- kaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19880801.6 | 31.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019JP42920 | Priority number, date | JP20180206023 | 31.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018206023 | JP20190075179 | 10.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019075179 | [2021/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020091012 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876682 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02, H05K1/03, // A61B5/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
H05K1/0283 (EP,US);
H05K1/0271 (KR);
H01L21/768 (KR);
H01L23/522 (KR);
H05K1/0313 (KR);
H05K1/189 (US);
H05K3/0014 (EP,US);
H05K3/0064 (US);
H05K3/1208 (US);
H01L2224/2929 (EP);
H01L2224/293 (EP);
H01L2224/32227 (EP);
H01L24/29 (EP);
H01L24/32 (EP);
H01L2924/12041 (EP);
H05K2201/0133 (EP);
H05K2201/0145 (EP,KR);
H05K2201/0154 (EP,KR);
H05K2201/09063 (US);
H05K2201/09281 (US);
H05K2201/09872 (EP);
H05K2201/10106 (EP);
H05K2201/2009 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0271 (EP);
H05K3/064 (EP);
H05K3/1216 (EP);
H05K3/284 (EP);
H05K3/321 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | H05K1/02, H01L21/768, H01L23/522, H05K1/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | LEITERPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER LEITERPLATTE | [2021/36] | English: | WIRING BOARD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING WIRING BOARD | [2021/36] | French: | CARTE DE CÂBLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CARTE DE CÂBLAGE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2021 | Translation filed | 12.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 22.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004192082 (WAGNER SIGURD [US], et al) [Y] 24* paragraph [0075]; figure 10 *; | [XI]US2014299362 (PARK CHAN WOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,17,23 * paragraphs [0038] - [0045]; figures 1,2 * [I] 14; | [XY]US2015147854 (JUNG SOON-WON [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,7-13,17-23 * paragraphs [0033] - [0050]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 24; | [X]US2016165719 (LI JIANG [US], et al) [X] 1-8,17,23 * paragraphs [0014] , [0031] , [0043] - [0058]; figures 3B,4C * | International search | [YA]KR20090092982 (SEOUL NAT UNIV IND FOUNDATION [KR]) [Y] 25-29 * , *[A] 15; | [XYA]US2014218872 (PARK CHAN WOO [KR], et al) [X] 18-24 * 16, &KR 10-2014-0100299 A. * [Y] 9-11, 14, 16, 17, 25-29 [A] 15; | [YA]JP2014162124 (FUJIKURA LTD) [Y] 1-14, 16, 17, 25-27, 29 * , * [A] 15; | [YA]JP2014162125 (FUJIKURA LTD) [Y] 1-14, 16, 17, 25-27, 29 * , * [A] 15; | [XYA]US2014299362 (PARK CHAN WOO [KR], et al) [X] 18, 19, 24 * 75, & KR 10-2014-0121325 A. * [Y] 1-14, 16, 17, 25-27, 29 [A] 15; | [YA]US2016049602 (KIM YOUNGCHAN [KR]) [Y] 16, 17 * , & KR 10-2016-0020034 A. * [A] 15; | [YA]JP2016509375 [Y] 1-14, 16, 17, 25-27, 29 * , &CA 2901789 A1, & CN 105340371 A,&EP 2959755 A1, & KR 10-2015-0122721 A,& US 2016/0081192 A1,&US 2016/030959 4 A1, & US 2018/0302988 A1, & WO 2014/ 130928 A2, & US 2014/0240932 A1 * [A] 15 | by applicant | JP2007281406 |