EP3877475 - SYNERGISTIC CORROSION INHIBITOR COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The United States Of America As Represented By The Secretary of the Navy Naval Air Warfare Center-Aircraft Division 47076 Liljencrantz Road B435 Suite A Patuxent River, MD 20670-1550 / US | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATZDORF, Craig 24664 Half Pone Point Road Hollywood, MD 20636 / US | 02 /
PEPE, Frank 23246 Foxglove Street California, MD 20619 / US | 03 /
BRINDZA, Michael 42290 Bird Haven Drive Leonardtown, MD 20650 / US | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 26 Northumberland Square North Shields, Tyne & Wear NE30 1PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 26 Northumberland Square North Shields, Tyne&Wear NE30 1PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 19881188.7 | 08.01.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019US12590 | Priority number, date | US201816184264 | 08.11.2018 Original published format: US201816184264 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020096633 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3877475 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D163/00, C09D175/04, C09D179/08 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
C09D5/084 (EP,US);
C08G18/40 (EP);
C08G18/73 (EP);
C08G18/758 (EP);
C08K3/32 (US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C09D163/00 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US);
C09D5/086 (EP,US);
C09D7/48 (EP);
C09D7/61 (US);
C09D7/63 (US);
C23C22/12 (EP);
C23F11/08 (EP);
C23F11/188 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D163/00, C08K5/098, C08K2003/324 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCHE KORROSIONSINHIBITORZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2021/37] | English: | SYNERGISTIC CORROSION INHIBITOR COMPOSITIONS | [2021/37] | French: | COMPOSITIONS SYNERGIQUES D'INHIBITEUR DE CORROSION | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 17.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US3099521 (ARENSBERG HANS G) [I] 1-5 * table bridging columns 3, 4;; claims 1, 5-9, 18-20 * [Y] 6-9; | [A]US3304267 (MILLER LEO D) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2012025142 (VISSER PETER [NL], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]CN106752417 (ZHONGSHAN DEGAOXING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CENTER (LIMITED PARTNERSHIP)) [X] 10-15 * paragraphs [0061] , [0062]; examples 1-3; claims 3,4; table 1 *; | [Y]US2018282555 (MATZDORF CRAIG [US], et al) [Y] 6-9 * paragraphs [0023] - [0026]; figures 1-3; claims 14,15 * | International search | [XY]US3099521 (ARENSBERG HANS G) [X] 1-5 * , col 1 In 27-38, col 2 In 16-20, col 2 In 44-71, col 3 In 14-20, col 4 In 13-24. * [Y] 6-9; | [A]US3304267 (MILLER LEO D) [A] 1-15 * , entire document. *; | [Y]US2012025142 (VISSER PETER [NL], et al) [Y] 10-15 * , para [0008], [0011], [0014], [0016], [0025], [0028]-[0029], [0034], [0037], [0054], [0085], [0095]. *; | [A]US2014070136 (YANG BO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire document. *; | [A]US2016177104 (FUJITA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* , entire document. *; | [Y]US2018282555 (MATZDORF CRAIG [US], et al) [Y] 6-15 * , para [0006], [0011], [0013], [0015], [0021]-[0022], [0030]; claims. * |