EP3877554 - LOCALIZED RESISTANCE ANNEALING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNA INTERNATIONAL INC 337 Magna Drive Aurora Ontario L4G 7K1 / CA | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENNER, Pavlo 52 Ed Quigg Way Woodbridge, Ontario L4H 2S1 / CA | 02 /
NIU, Xiaoping 90 Rushingbrook Drive Richmond Hill, Ontario L4S 2A3 / CA | 03 /
DENIJS, Eric 187 Ontario Street Toronto, Ontario M5A 2V6 / CA | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 19881531.8 | 04.11.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019CA51560 | Priority number, date | US201862755637P | 05.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862755637 P | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020093143 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3877554 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/26, B21D37/16, B21J15/00, B21D53/88, B23K11/06, B21J15/02, C22F1/04, C22C38/04, C22C38/02, B23K11/11, C22C21/02, C21D1/40, C21D8/00, B23P15/00, B23K11/22, B23K11/16, B23K101/00, B23K101/18, C22C38/00, C21D9/00, // B21D28/24, B21D28/10, B21D19/08 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
B21J15/025 (EP);
C21D9/0068 (EP,US);
B21D37/16 (US);
B21D53/88 (EP,US);
B21J15/00 (EP);
B21J15/02 (US);
B23K11/061 (EP);
B23K11/115 (EP);
B23K11/16 (EP);
B23K11/22 (EP);
B23P15/00 (EP);
C21D1/26 (EP,US);
C21D1/40 (EP);
C21D8/00 (EP);
C21D8/005 (EP);
C22C21/02 (EP);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22F1/04 (EP);
B21D19/088 (EP);
B21D28/10 (EP);
B21D28/24 (EP);
B23K2101/006 (EP);
B23K2101/18 (EP);
C21D2221/00 (EP);
C21D2221/02 (EP);
C21D2261/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/37] | C21D1/26, B21D37/16, B21D53/88, B21J15/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | LOKALISIERTES WIDERSTANDSGLÜHVERFAHREN | [2021/37] | English: | LOCALIZED RESISTANCE ANNEALING PROCESS | [2021/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RECUIT PAR RÉSISTANCE LOCALISÉ | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 15.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003167621 (WANG PEI-CHUNG [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * § 0024, 0029, 0030; cl. 1; fig. 1 -4 * [I] 10; | [X]US2014290064 (SMEYERS AXEL ALEXANDER MARIA [BE], et al) [X] 1-8* § 0037; fig. 1, 4; cl. 1 *; | [XI]DE102016113598 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [X] 1-8 * § 0034,0046; cl. 1-20; fig. 1 * [I] 9-15; | [X]US2018187281 (POTOCKI JOHN RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * § 0092, 0093; fig. 3 A-C * | International search | [XY]DE102013011572 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1-3, 9, 11, 12, 15 * (English language translation by Espacenet) ** paragraphs 0002, 0006, 0010, 0011, 0013, 0015, 0019-0021, 0029, 0037 ** [Y] 4-8, 10, 13, 14; | [XY]US2015159234 (STEFFENS HUBERTUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3, 9, 11, 12, 15 ** paragraphs 0013-0015, 0021, 0022, 0027, 0071 **[Y] 4-8, 10, 13, 14; | [XY]WO2017081072 (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI]) [X] 1-3 ** page 1, lines 4-6; page 4, lines 5-13; page 5, lines 7-22; page 6, lines 1-2; claim 1 ** [Y] 4-8 | by applicant | US2003167621 | US2014290064 | DE102016113598 | US2018187281 |