EP3879418 - IDENTITY VERIFICATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced New Technologies Co., Ltd. Cayman Corporate Centre 27 Hospital Road George Town, Grand Cayman KY1-9008 / KY | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Dapeng Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3, No.969 West Wen Yi Road, Yu Hang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Wenbiao Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3, No.969 West Wen Yi Road, Yu Hang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | 03 /
JIN, Hong Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3, No.969 West Wen Yi Road, Yu Hang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 19881617.5 | 27.09.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019CN108718 | Priority number, date | CN201811308672 | 05.11.2018 Original published format: CN201811308672 | [2021/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020093817 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3879418 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3879418 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, G06F21/88, G06N20/20, G06F18/243, G06F18/20, G06N5/01, G06N7/01, // G06F21/45 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G06F21/88 (EP,US);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F18/24323 (EP,CN);
G06F18/295 (EP,US);
G06F21/31 (CN);
G06F21/316 (US);
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06F21/45 (EP,CN);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N20/20 (EP);
G06N5/01 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | G06F21/32, G06F21/88, G06K9/62, G06N5/00, G06N7/00, G06N20/20, // G06F21/45 | ||
Former IPC [2021/37] | G06F21/31 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IDENTITÄTSVERIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2021/37] | English: | IDENTITY VERIFICATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2021/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE VÉRIFICATION D'IDENTITÉ | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2021 | Translation filed | 12.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 16.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003051147 (MAEDA TAKUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0114] * * figures 2, 3, 6-10 *; | [A]US9355234 (MAGI SHAASHUA TRIINU [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 38 - line 45 * * column 1, line 56 - line 58 * * column 2, line 2 - line 5 * * column 2, line 10 - line 13 * * column 2, line 21 - line 28 * * column 2, line 36 - line 37 * * column 2, line 43 - line 55 * * column 3, line 9 - line 17 * * column 3, line 23 - line 36 * * column 5, line 62 - line 64 * * column 6, line 7 - line 9 * * column 7, line 1 - line 2 * * column 7, line 15 - line 19 * * column 7, line 42 - line 45 * * column 7, line 57 - line 59 * * column 8, line 1 - line 2 * * column 8, line 16 - line 30 * * column 8, line 48 - line 65 * * column 9, line 7 - line 11 ** figures 3, 5 * |