EP3877382 - NOVEL COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT OF RESPIRATORY DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tianli Biotech Pty Ltd Level 1, 401 Nancy Millis Building Melbourne, VIC 3010 / AU | [2024/04] |
Former [2021/37] | For all designated states The University of Melbourne Grattan Street The University of Melbourne Victoria 3010 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEWART, Alastair c/- The University of Melbourne, Intellectual Property & Licences Research Innovation & Commercialisation The University of Melbourne, Victoria 3010 / AU | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Spencer c/- The University of Melbourne, Intellectual Property & Licences Research Innovation & Commercialisation The University of Melbourne, Victoria 3010 / AU | 03 /
HAKKI, Zalihe c/- The University of Melbourne, Intellectual Property & Licences Research Innovation & Commercialisation The University of Melbourne, Victoria 3010 / AU | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19881903.9 | 07.11.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019AU51225 | Priority number, date | AU20180904241 | 07.11.2018 Original published format: AU 2018904241 | AU20180904242 | 07.11.2018 Original published format: AU 2018904242 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020093098 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3877382 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/14, C07D401/04, C07D403/04, C07D409/14, C07D401/14, A61K31/506, A61P11/00 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP,AU,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,AU,US);
A61P11/00 (EP,AU,US);
A61P11/06 (AU);
C07D401/04 (AU);
C07D401/14 (EP,AU);
|
Former IPC [2021/37] | C07D405/14, C07D401/04, C07D403/04, A61K31/506, A61P11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ATEMWEGSERKRANKUNGEN | [2021/37] | English: | NOVEL COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT OF RESPIRATORY DISEASES | [2021/37] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES RESPIRATOIRES | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 12.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5670527 (ADAMS JERRY LEROY [US], et al) [X] 15* RN Nr: 187217-96-5, 165-806-48-4,165806-50-8,165806-51-9,165806-79-1,165806-82-6,187217-97-6; column 1, line 11 - column 1, line 15 *; | [X]WO9918942 (IMP COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 15 * RN Nr. 1656806-48-4, 165806-50-8,165806-51-9, 165806-79-1,165806-82-6,220654-11-5; page 1, line 7 - page 1, line 8 *; | [X]US2011098272 (SUBRAMANYAM CHAKRAPANI [US], et al) [X] 15 * paragraph [0001]; examples 1,3,4,17-30,32-38 *; | [X] - BING-KE LI ET AL, "In silico prediction of spleen tyrosine kinase inhibitors using machine learning approaches and an optimized molecular descriptor subset generated by recursive feature elimination method", COMPUTERS IN BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, (20130501), vol. 43, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.compbiomed.2013.01.015, ISSN 0010-4825, pages 395 - 404, XP055143456 [X] 1-5,10,14 * RN:1551022-37-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compbiomed.2013.01.015 | [X] - RUDOLPH JOHANNES ET AL, "Slow Inhibition and Conformation Selective Properties of Extracellular Signal-Regulated Kinase 1 and 2 Inhibitors", BIOCHEMISTRY, (20150113), vol. 54, no. 1, doi:10.1021/bi501101v, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 22 - 31, XP055929434 [X] 15 * abstract; table 1, compound SB220025 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi501101v | [X] - TRAVIS T. WAGER ET AL, "Casein Kinase 1delta/epsilon Inhibitor PF-5006739 Attenuates Opioid Drug-Seeking Behavior", ACS CHEMICAL NEUROSCIENCE, US, (20141028), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1021/cn500201x, ISSN 1948-7193, pages 1253 - 1265, XP055747252 [X] 15 * tabel 1, compounds 1-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cn500201x | [X] - F R Pinsetta ET AL, "Send Orders of Reprints at [email protected] Rational Design of Novel Potential p38 MAPK Inhibitors with Drug-like Properties Using Pharmacophore and Similarity-based Virtual Screening Procedures", (20130301), URL: http://72.167.252.165/download.php?param=Sk9VnUk5zBTFeMvQjkVO1L0NfCQyx85LpzEveRDArwMDuJCQpy5woZGZl8fG3FwckGxpuY2Fk0aW39uLt3Bk7Znxw8YWEM0OCWY02OTdzjMz6RlYxjgwkYjYp2OD6ExZdjdhENmVAjZjnk1YdzQTcVYv&key=QVhFAaWRtFLUzVJQ7TMytRDMu1RjectNjDMygLTIpzNDjMyMC0RHxZUQ4TcVY, (20140715), XP055128951 [X] 15 * figure 3, compounds IBMK,IBL7 * | [X] - NATALIE B VINH ET AL, "Virtual screening using a conformationally flexible target protein: models for ligand binding to p38Î MAPK", JOURNAL OF COMPUTER-AIDED MOLECULAR DESIGN, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20120420), vol. 26, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S10822-012-9569-7, ISSN 1573-4951, pages 409 - 423, XP035053360 [X] 15 * abstract; figure 3, compounds SB218655, SB220025, SB216385, 1-18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10822-012-9569-7 | International search | [X]WO9621654 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-32, 34-36 * examples on pages 11, lines 3-11, page 12, lines 1-4, lines 33-38; page 32, compounds 5 to 9; page 33, compound 10, page 37, lines 17 to 19; page 38, line 22; claims 1, 13, 19 *; | [X]US5593992 (ADAMS JERRY L [US], et al) [X] 1-32, 34-36 * col 11, lines 58-59, lines 62-63, lines 64-65, col 12, lines 58-59, claims 1, 11, 14 and 28 *; | [A]WO9735856 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-32, 34-36 * page 15, lines 19, 21, 22; page 16, line 21, 25, 28; page 17, line 31, 33, 34, 35; page 18, lines 3, 30, 32; page 19, line 25, 27 and 29 *; | [X]WO9901136 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-32, 34-36 * examples, claims 1, 9, 10, 13 *; | [X]WO9932121 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-32, 34-36 * page 19, Table, 2nd, 3rd, 4th, 5th, 6th and 8th compounds, page 20, Table, 1st compound; page 21, Table, 2nd and 3rd compounds; page 22, Table, 1st, 2nd , 3rd, 5th and 6th compounds, examples, page 30, line 32 and 35; page 32, lines 10-12; page 33, lines 14-15; claims 4, 10, page 26, line 25 to page 28, line 29 *; | [A]US6369068 (ADAMS JERRY LEROY [US], et al) [A] 1-32, 34-36 * col 7, lines 8-33, Examples *; | [X]WO2016149756 (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU]) [X] 35 * claims 5 and 6, second compound, claims 7 to 21 *; | [XP]WO2018201192 (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU]) [XP] 1-32, 34-36* Formula (I), Figure 8, compound 184, Abstract, page 57, compounds 13, 16, 19, 22, 25, 28, 31, 34, 37, 43, 14, 17, 20, 23, 26, 29, 32, 35, 38, 44; page 72, compounds 47, 48; page 74, compounds 51, 52, page 77, compound 55; page 79, compounds 73, 74, 75; page 87, compounds 81, 82, 83, 84; page 91, compounds 86, 87, 89, 90 *; | [X] - KEENAN, C. R. et al., "Casein Kinase 1δ/ε Inhibitor, PF670462 Attenuates the Fibrogenic Effects of Transforming Growth Factor-β in Pulmonary Fibrosis", Frontiers in Pharmacology, (20180700), vol. 9, page 738, XP055707234 [X] 35 * . the whole document and Title, Introdcution * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fphar.2018.00738 | [A] - KIM, D-K. et al., "Synthesis and biological evaluation of trisubstituted imidazole derivatives as inhibitors of p38a mitogen-activated protein kinase", Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20080000), vol. 18, no. 14, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.06.007, pages 4006 - 4010, XP022852885 [A] 1-32, 34-36 * page 4008, compounds 20a, 20b, 20c, 20d, 21a, 22a, 22b, 22c, 23a, Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.06.007 | [X] - CAS, (20111205), Database accession no. 1349012-04-9, URL: STN [X] 1-3, 7-9, 20-21, 23-25 * ; 2-Pyrimidinamine, N-(3-[1,1'-biphenyl]-3-ylpropyl)-4-[1-cyclohexyl-4-(4- fluorophenyl)-1H-imidazol-5-yl]-the whole document * |