EP3847814 - POSITION DEPENDENT STORAGE OF MOTION INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Bytedance Network Technology Co., Ltd. Room B-0035 2/F Building 3 No.30 Shixing Road Shijingshan District Beijing 100041 / CN | For all designated states ByteDance Inc. 12655 West Jefferson Boulevard Sixth Floor, Suite No. 137 Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | For all designated states Beijing Bytedance Network Technology Co. Ltd. Room B-0035 2/F Building 3 No.30 Shixing Road Shijingshan District Beijing 100041 / CN | ||
For all designated states ByteDance Inc. 12655 West Jefferson Boulevard Sixth Floor, Suite No. 137 Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Li 12655 West Jefferson Boulevard Sixth Floor, Suite No. 137 Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Kai 12655 West Jefferson Boulevard Sixth Floor, Suite No. 137 Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 03 /
LIU, Hongbin Jinritoutiao Post Office, China Satellite Communications Tower, No.63, Zhichun Road Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Yue Jinritoutiao Post Office, China Satellite Communications Tower, No.63, Zhichun Road Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Na Jinritoutiao Post Office, China Satellite Communications Tower, No.63, Zhichun Road Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19882035.9 | 06.11.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019CN116078 | Priority number, date | WO2018CN114057 | 06.11.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/114057 | WO2019CN87372 | 17.05.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/087372 | WO2019CN90127 | 05.06.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/090127 | WO2019CN92151 | 20.06.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/092151 | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020094078 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3847814 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/52, H04N19/50, H04N19/186, H04N19/176 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
H04N19/119 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/52 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (KR,US);
H04N19/132 (KR,US);
H04N19/137 (KR,US);
H04N19/139 (KR,US);
H04N19/159 (KR,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/46 (US);
H04N19/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | POSITIONSABHÄNGIGE SPEICHERUNG VON BEWEGUNGSINFORMATIONEN | [2021/28] | English: | POSITION DEPENDENT STORAGE OF MOTION INFORMATION | [2021/28] | French: | STOCKAGE DÉPENDANT DE LA POSITION, D'INFORMATIONS DE MOUVEMENT | [2021/28] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |