EP3878596 - FLUX, METHOD FOR APPLYING FLUX, AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING SOLDER BALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senju Metal Industry Co., Ltd. 23, Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIZAKI Takahiro c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD., 23, Senju- Hashido-cho, Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | 02 /
FUKUYAMA Naoaki c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD., 23, Senju- Hashido-cho, Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | 03 /
KAWASAKI Hiroyoshi c/o SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD., 23, Senju- Hashido-cho, Adachi-ku Tokyo 120-8555 / JP | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 19882815.4 | 05.11.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019JP43279 | Priority number, date | JP20180208657 | 06.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018208657 | [2021/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020095892 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3878596 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/363, H05K3/34, B23K35/26, B23K35/36, C22C13/00, B23K35/362 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
B23K35/362 (EP,US);
B23K35/26 (KR);
B23K35/3612 (EP);
B23K35/3613 (EP);
B23K35/3617 (EP);
B23K35/3618 (EP);
C22C13/00 (KR);
H05K3/34 (KR);
H05K3/3489 (EP,US);
B23K2101/36 (US);
B23K35/262 (EP);
H05K2203/041 (EP);
H05K3/3478 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/37] | B23K35/363, H05K3/34, B23K35/26, C22C13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | FLUSSMITTEL, VERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG EINES FLUSSMITTES UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE VON LÖTKUGELN | [2021/37] | English: | FLUX, METHOD FOR APPLYING FLUX, AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING SOLDER BALL | [2021/37] | French: | FLUX, PROCÉDÉ POUR APPLIQUER UN FLUX ET PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION D'UNE BILLE DE SOUDURE | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2021 | Translation filed | 27.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 18.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 11.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN100336626C (UNIV BEIJING POLYTECHNIC [CN]) [A] 1-16* page 4, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 1; claim 1 *; | [A]JP2012236224 (ARAKAWA CHEM IND) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0011] - [0037] - [0045]; examples 39,40; table 8 *; | [A]CN102513732B (UNIV CENTRAL SOUTH) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0023] - [0027]; example 1 *; | [A]JP2017100137 (ARAKAWA CHEM IND) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0015] - [0048]; tables 1,2 *; | [A]CN108465984 (GUANGDONG JIANXIN SCIENCE AND TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0049] - [0065]; example 5 * | International search | [A]JPS6332525B [A] 1-16; | [A]JP2004074267 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-16; | [A]JP2014195825 (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-16; | [A]JP2017100137 (ARAKAWA CHEM IND) [A] 1-16 | by applicant | JP2009253088 |