EP3882631 - METHOD FOR SUPPRESSING ABNORMAL DETECTION IN IMMUNOASSAY BY AUTOMATIC ANALYSIS DEVICE, AND IMMUNOASSAY REAGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Medical Co., Ltd. 1-3, Nihonbashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Tadaaki c/o SEKISUI MEDICAL CO., LTD., 1-3, Nihonbashi 2- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 02 /
MIZUNIWA, Chihiro c/o SEKISUI MEDICAL CO., LTD., 1-3, Nihonbashi 2- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 03 /
KITAHARA, Shinichiro c/o SEKISUI MEDICAL CO., LTD., 1-3, Nihonbashi 2- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Hiroshi c/o SEKISUI MEDICAL CO., LTD., 1-3, Nihonbashi 2- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19883201.6 | 08.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019JP43799 | Priority number, date | JP20180211559 | 09.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018211559 | [2021/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020096029 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882631 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/531, G01N33/543 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
G01N33/5306 (EP,US);
G01N33/531 (KR);
G01N21/77 (US);
G01N2021/7783 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON ABNORMALEM NACHWEIS IN IMMUNOASSAY DURCH AUTOMATISCHE ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG UND IMMUNOASSAY-REAGENZ | [2021/38] | English: | METHOD FOR SUPPRESSING ABNORMAL DETECTION IN IMMUNOASSAY BY AUTOMATIC ANALYSIS DEVICE, AND IMMUNOASSAY REAGENT | [2021/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR SUPPRIMER UNE DÉTECTION ANORMALE DANS UN DOSAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE PAR UN DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE AUTOMATIQUE, ET RÉACTIF DE DOSAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2021 | Translation filed | 07.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 14.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/36] | 07.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS604938B ; | [X]JPH06300761 (EIKEN CHEMICAL); | [X]EP2881738 (SEKISUI MEDICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [X]CN107607707 (MACCURA BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | International search | [Y]JPS5847256 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND, et al); | [A]JPS648307B ; | [A]JPH0682450 (EIKEN CHEMICAL); | [A]JPH0650313B ; | [XA]JP2682697B ; | [A]JPH10253629 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH11183478 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2000258419 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2001330615 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]US2002127741 (SALES AMILL MIQUEL [ES], et al); | [Y]JP2018173334 (SHIMA KENKYUSHO KK) | by applicant | JPS5847256 | JP2003066047 | JP2003226893 | WO2011065573 | JP2013068443 | JP2013140035 |