EP3881249 - SCALABLE NEUTRAL ATOM BASED QUANTUM COMPUTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atom Computing Inc. 918 Parker Street, Suite A-13 Berkeley, CA 94710 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KING, Jonathan 918 Parker Street, Suite A-13 Berkeley, California 94710 / US | 02 /
BLOOM, Benjamin 918 Parker Street, Suite A-13 Berkeley, California 94710 / US | 03 /
KOTRU, Krish 918 Parker Street, Suite A-13 Berkeley, California 94710 / US | 04 /
LESTER, Brian 918 Parker Street, Suite A-13 Berkeley, California 94710 / US | 05 /
PARSONS, Maxwell 918 Parker Street, Suite A-13 Berkeley, California 94710 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | TLIP Limited Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | TLIP Limited 14 King Street Leeds LS1 2HL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19883636.3 | 12.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019US61029 | Priority number, date | US201862760781P | 13.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862760781 P | US201962815985P | 08.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962815985 P | US201916405877 | 07.05.2019 Original published format: US201916405877 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020102256 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881249 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N10/00, G06N10/20, G06N3/00, G06N3/04, G06N5/00, G06N7/00, G06N10/40, G06N20/20 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
G06N10/40 (EP,KR);
G06N10/00 (US);
G06N10/20 (EP,KR);
G06N10/60 (KR);
G06N20/20 (EP,KR);
B82Y10/00 (KR);
G06N3/006 (EP);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/047 (EP);
G06N5/01 (EP);
G06N5/025 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | G06N10/00, B82Y10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | SKALIERBARE NEUTRALE ATOMBASIERTE QUANTENBERECHNUNG | [2021/38] | English: | SCALABLE NEUTRAL ATOM BASED QUANTUM COMPUTING | [2021/38] | French: | CALCUL QUANTIQUE BASÉ SUR LES ATOMES NEUTRES ÉVOLUTIF | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 08.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - DAVID S. WEISS ET AL, "Quantum computing with neutral atoms", PHYSICS TODAY., US, (20170701), vol. 70, no. 7, doi:10.1063/PT.3.3626, ISSN 0031-9228, pages 44 - 50, XP055705385 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/PT.3.3626 | [I] - Saffman M, "Quantum computing with atomic qubits and Rydberg interactions: Progress and challenges", (20160724), pages 1 - 27, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1605.05207.pdf, (20220719), XP055943986 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - MALTE SCHLOSSER ET AL, "Scalable architecture for quantum information processing with atoms in optical micro-structures", QUANTUM INFORMATION PROCESSING, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20110915), vol. 10, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S11128-011-0297-Z, ISSN 1573-1332, pages 907 - 924, XP019969803 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11128-011-0297-z | [A] - LUNDBLAD NATHAN, "Designer atom arrays for quantum computing", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP UK, LONDON, vol. 561, no. 7721, doi:10.1038/D41586-018-06107-8, ISSN 0028-0836, (20180905), pages 43 - 44, (20180905), XP036582793 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/d41586-018-06107-8 | [A] - NORCIA M A ET AL, "Microscopic control and detection of ultracold strontium in optical-tweezer arrays", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20181015), doi:10.1103/PHYSREVX.8.041054, XP081066074 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevX.8.041054 | International search | [A]US2006179029 (VALA JIRI [US], et al) [A] 1-105; | [A]KR20120046121 (KEK HIGH ENERGY ACCELERATOR [JP], et al) [A] 1-105; | [A]US2016125311 (FUECHSLE MARTIN [AU], et al)[A] 1-105; | [AX]US9858531 (MONROE CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-98,100,101,103-105 [X] 99,102; | [A] - Nitzan Akerman; Nir Navon; Shlomi Kotler; Yinnon Glickman; Roee Ozeri, "Universal gate-set for trapped-ion qubits using a narrow linewidth diode laser", arXiv.org, (20150511), doi:10.1088/1367-2630/17/11/113060, XP081337410 [A] 1-105 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1367-2630/17/11/113060 |