EP3857922 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING SERVICES IN LOCAL AREA DATA NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/31] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Chihyun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sangjin 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
BAEK, Soohyun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19884662.8 | 28.05.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019KR06396 | Priority number, date | KR20180141962 | 16.11.2018 Original published format: KR 20180141962 | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020101133 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3857922 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3857922 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04W48/18, // H04W60/04, H04W76/10 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W4/021 (KR);
H04W64/006 (US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W48/08 (KR);
H04W88/18 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/50] | H04W4/021, H04W48/08, H04W88/18, // H04W60/04, H04W76/10 | ||
Former IPC [2021/31] | H04W4/021, H04W48/08, H04W88/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON DIENSTEN IN EINEM LOKALEN DATENNETZ | [2021/31] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING SERVICES IN LOCAL AREA DATA NETWORK | [2021/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE FOURNITURE DE SERVICES DANS UN RÉSEAU LOCAL DE DONNÉES | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 09.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018279397 (FACCIN STEFANO [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2014297790 (SONG IN-JEE [KR], et al); | [A]WO2017100640 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS INC [US]); |