EP3881686 - TOBACCO-CONTAINING SEGMENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, NONCOMBUSTIBLE HEATING-SMOKING ARTICLE AND NONCOMBUSTIBLE HEATING-SMOKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 1-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6927 / JP | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOTODAMARI, Tetsuya c/o Japan Tobacco Inc., 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19885004.2 | 12.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019JP44296 | Priority number, date | JP20180213388 | 14.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018213388 | [2021/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020100879 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881686 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24D1/02, A24F40/20, D21H19/20, D21H27/00, A24D1/20, A24B15/14 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
A24B15/14 (EP,KR);
A24D1/02 (EP,KR);
A24D1/002 (KR);
A24D1/025 (KR);
A24D1/042 (KR);
A24D1/20 (EP);
A24F40/46 (KR);
D21H19/20 (EP,KR);
D21H27/00 (EP,KR);
D21H5/16 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | A24D1/02, A24F40/20, D21H19/20, D21H27/00, A24D1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | TABAKHALTIGES SEGMENT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG, RAUCHARTIKEL MIT VERBRENNUNGSFREIEM HEIZEN UND RAUCHSYSTEM MIT VERBRENNUNGSFREIEM HEIZEN | [2021/38] | English: | TOBACCO-CONTAINING SEGMENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, NONCOMBUSTIBLE HEATING-SMOKING ARTICLE AND NONCOMBUSTIBLE HEATING-SMOKING SYSTEM | [2021/38] | French: | SEGMENT CONTENANT DU TABAC ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, ARTICLE À FUMER CHAUFFANT NON COMBUSTIBLE ET SYSTÈME POUR FUMER CHAUFFANT NON COMBUSTIBLE | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2021 | Translation filed | 06.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP2012065633 [ ]; | CN105018004 [ ]; | [A]US5692525 (COUNTS MARY ELLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004052128 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XYI]US2008017206 (BECKER ULRIKE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,10,12 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0071]; figure 2b; claims 1-3,6,7,20-26 * [Y] 1-12 [I] 4,5,8; | [XI]WO2011117755 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1,2,6,9-12 * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 14 * * page 9, line 13 - page 10, line 7; claims 1-5,13-15 * [I] 8; | [Y]JP2012065633 (IGARASHI SATOSHI) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,3; example 1 *; | [A]CN105018004 (CHINA TOBACCO YUNNAN IND CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010]; claims 1-3 * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 26, Database accession no. 2012-E03831, & JP2012065633 A 20120405 (IGARASHI S) [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2016, no. 09, Database accession no. 2015-725079, & CN105018004 A 20151104 (YUNNAN CHINA TOBACCO IND CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2012065633 (IGARASHI SATOSHI) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0035]-[0037], fig. 1 *; | [A]WO2014068703 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0007] *; | [A]JP2017533732 (JT INTERNATIONAL SA) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0049]-[0050], fig. 2 *; | [A]US2018007972 (THORENS MICHEL [CH]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0171], [0282]-[0285], fig. 2 *; | [A]JP2018504124 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A.) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0103]-[0106], fig. 1 *; | [PA]JP2019126290 (NIPPON PAPER PAPYLIA CO LTD) [PA] 1-12* paragraphs [0009]-[0020], fig. 1 * | by applicant | JP5292410B | JP5771338B |