EP3841480 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSCEIVING CONTROL SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Wookwang 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KHURANA, Guneet Singh 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
MOSKVITIN, Dmitriy 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 19885259.2 | 13.11.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019KR15451 | Priority number, date | KR20180139239 | 13.11.2018 Original published format: KR 20180139239 | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020101351 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841480 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/14, G06F13/40, G06F9/4401 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
G06F1/266 (EP,US);
G06F13/14 (KR);
G06F9/4411 (US);
G06F1/3215 (EP);
G06F1/3246 (EP);
G06F13/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN-EMPFANGEN EINES STEUERSIGNALS | [2021/26] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSCEIVING CONTROL SIGNAL | [2021/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION-RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL DE COMMANDE | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 30.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007028127 (KIM HAK-SOO [KR]) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0046] - [0059]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2013013904 (TRAN TERESA [US]) [A] 1-7* paragraphs [0002] - [0028]; figures 1-3; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]US2013205060 (BENHARD RYAN GORDON [US], et al) [Y] 3-7 * paragraphs [0024] - [0042]; figures 1-4 *; | [IY]US2015082015 (CHEN YINGGUO [CN], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraphs [0004] - [0087]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 3-7; | [Y]US9652252 (KOCHAR YATHARTH K [IN], et al) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 10 - column 11, line 63; figures 1-7 *; | [XY]US2018143927 (KIM SHIN-HO [KR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0004] - [0170]; figures 1-12 * [Y] 2-7; | [XI] - "UNIVERSAL SERIAL BUS SPECIFICATION REVISION 2.0", UNIVERSAL SERIAL BUS SPECIFICATION,, (20000427), no. REV. 2.0, pages 1 - 622, XP001544046 [X] 1 * paragraphs [09.3] - [09.4] * [I] 2-7 | International search | [Y]US2010262392 (MURPHY ROBERT DALE [US], et al) [Y] 8,14; | [A]US2017097666 (SHIN DONGRAK [KR], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2018032350 (LEE WOO KWANG [KR], et al)[A] 1-15; | [YX]US2018143927 (KIM SHIN-HO [KR], et al) [Y] 2-15 [X] 1; | [Y]KR20180108225 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2-15 | by applicant | US2007028127 | US2013013904 | US2013205060 | US2015082015 | US9652252 | US2018143927 |