EP3850147 - WATER TRANSMISSION DEVICE AND WASHING MACHINE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKASHIMA, Takahiro 2-7, Sugasawa-cho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0027 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Kazushi 2-7, Sugasawa-cho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0027 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Yuichi 2-7, Sugasawa-cho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0027 / JP | 04 /
NISHIOKA, Yoshiyuki 2-7, Sugasawa-cho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0027 / JP | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19885492.9 | 13.11.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019KR15395 | Priority number, date | JP20180213952 | 14.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018213952 | KR20190130574 | 21.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190130574 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020101335 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850147 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3850147 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/10, D06F39/08 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
D06F39/085 (EP,KR,US);
D06F39/10 (EP,KR,US);
F04B17/00 (KR,US);
F04B53/16 (KR,US);
F04B53/20 (KR,US);
F04D29/4273 (EP,KR,US);
F04D29/708 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | D06F39/08, D06F39/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERLEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND WASCHMASCHINE DAMIT | [2021/29] | English: | WATER TRANSMISSION DEVICE AND WASHING MACHINE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2021/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'EAU ET LAVE-LINGE COMPRENANT LEDIT DISPOSITIF | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 20.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2019 | AL | 15.06.2022 | AT | 15.06.2022 | CY | 15.06.2022 | CZ | 15.06.2022 | DK | 15.06.2022 | EE | 15.06.2022 | ES | 15.06.2022 | FI | 15.06.2022 | HR | 15.06.2022 | IT | 15.06.2022 | LT | 15.06.2022 | LV | 15.06.2022 | MC | 15.06.2022 | MK | 15.06.2022 | MT | 15.06.2022 | NL | 15.06.2022 | PL | 15.06.2022 | RO | 15.06.2022 | RS | 15.06.2022 | SE | 15.06.2022 | SI | 15.06.2022 | SK | 15.06.2022 | SM | 15.06.2022 | TR | 15.06.2022 | BG | 15.09.2022 | NO | 15.09.2022 | GR | 16.09.2022 | IS | 15.10.2022 | PT | 17.10.2022 | IE | 13.11.2022 | LU | 13.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | FR | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 13.11.2019 | |
AL | 15.06.2022 | ||
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CY | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
IT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
MK | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
TR | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
IE | 13.11.2022 | ||
LU | 13.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 13.11.2019 | |
AL | 15.06.2022 | ||
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CY | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
IT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
MK | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
IE | 13.11.2022 | ||
LU | 13.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 13.11.2019 | |
AL | 15.06.2022 | ||
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CY | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
IT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
IE | 13.11.2022 | ||
LU | 13.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CY | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
IT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
IE | 13.11.2022 | ||
LU | 13.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
IT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
IE | 13.11.2022 | ||
LU | 13.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
IE | 13.11.2022 | ||
LU | 13.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
IE | 13.11.2022 | ||
LU | 13.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
IE | 13.11.2022 | ||
LU | 13.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
LU | 13.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE4302497 (MASSINDUSTRIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 31; figure - * [A] 7-12[I] 2-4; | [XAI]KR20080099113 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0063]; figure - * [A] 7-12 [I] 2-4 | International search | [A]US6167733 (LEE SANG DAE [KR]) [A] 1-12; | [A]JP2001321596 (SHARP KK)[A] 1-12; | [X]US7243512 (KIM KEON [KR], et al) [X] 1; | [A]KR20070113432 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12; | [AX]US8881555 (KIM YOUNG HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 7-12 [X] 1-6 | by applicant | KR20080099113 | US8881555 | JP2016158743 |