EP3882858 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA ENCODING METHOD, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA DECODING METHOD, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA ENCODING DEVICE, AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA DECODING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 2050 W 190th Street Suite 450 Torrance, CA 90504 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGUCHI, Noritaka c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
SUGIO, Toshiyasu c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19885583.5 | 15.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019JP44913 | Priority number, date | US201862768488P | 16.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862768488 P | [2021/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020101021 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882858 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T9/40, H04N19/182, H04N19/70, H04N19/124, H04N19/436, G06T9/00, H04N19/174, H04N19/176 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H03M7/6023 (EP);
G06T9/00 (KR);
H04N19/17 (US);
G06T9/001 (EP);
G06T9/40 (EP);
H03M7/3064 (US);
H03M7/3084 (EP);
H03M7/6005 (US);
H03M7/6011 (US);
H04N19/124 (EP);
H04N19/174 (EP);
H04N19/176 (EP);
H04N19/182 (EP);
H04N19/20 (US);
H04N19/436 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | G06T9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER DATEN, VERFAHREN ZUR DECODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER DATEN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR CODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER DATEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DECODIERUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER DATEN | [2021/38] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA ENCODING METHOD, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA DECODING METHOD, THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA ENCODING DEVICE, AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL DATA DECODING DEVICE | [2021/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE DE DONNÉES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE DE DONNÉES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES, DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE DE DONNÉES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE DE DONNÉES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2021 | Translation filed | 05.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 10.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "PCC Test Model C13 v2", no. n17519, (20180716), 122. MPEG MEETING; 20180416 - 20180420; SAN DIEGO; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/122_San%20Diego/wg11/w17519.zip w17519.docx, (20180716), XP030264089 [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [3.1.1] , [ 3.2.2] , [ 3.3.3] * * table 1 * | [I] - MICHAEL SCHWARZ ET AL, "Fast parallel surface and solid voxelization on GPUs", ACM SIGGRAPH ASIA 2010 PAPERS ON, SIGGRAPH ASIA '10, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA, (20101215), doi:10.1145/1866158.1866201, ISBN 978-1-4503-0439-9, pages 1 - 10, XP058313233 [I] 1-8 * paragraph [04.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1866158.1866201 | [A] - RICARD (TECHNICOLOR) J ET AL, "[VPCC-TM] New contribution on duplicate point avoidance in TMC2", no. m44784, (20181007), 124. MPEG MEETING; 20181008 - 20181012; MACAO; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/124_Macao/wg11/m44784-v2-m44784-version1.zip m44784 - remove duplicate - v1.2.docx, (20181007), XP030193101 [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0002] * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - OHJI NAKAGAMI (SONY) ET AL, "Point cloud compression technology proposal by Sony", no. m41665, (20171021), 120. MPEG MEETING; 20171023 - 20171027; MACAU; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/120_Macau/wg11/m41665-v2-m41665.zip m41665.docx, (20171021), XP030260575 [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [4.2.3] , [ 4.2.5] , [00 8] * | [A] - VIKTOR KAEMPE ET AL, "High resolution sparse voxel DAGs", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, US, (20130701), vol. 32, no. 4, doi:10.1145/2461912.2462024, ISSN 0730-0301, page 1, XP055520698 [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2461912.2462024 | [AP] - NORITAKA IGUCHI (PANASONIC) ET AL, "[G-PCC] Clarification and Modification of CD syntax and semantics", no. m51064, (20191005), 128. MPEG MEETING; 20191007 - 20191011; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/128_Geneva/wg11/m51064-v1-m51064.zip m51064/m51064_[G-PCC] Clarificatoin_and_Modification_of_syntax.docx, (20191005), XP030221575 [AP] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2017068808 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-8* , *; | [A]JP2018159578 (NAT INSTITUTE FOR ENVIRONMENTAL STUDIES, et al) [A] 1-8 * , * | by applicant | WO2014020663 |