EP3880568 - HALF-SIZE PLASTIC PALLET WITH DECK SCOOP AREAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 27.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEP Technology Pty Limited Level 29 255 George Street Sydney, NSW 2000 / AU | [2023/26] |
Former [2021/38] | For all designated states CHEP Technology Pty Limited Level 10 Angel Place 123 Pitt Street Sydney, NSW 2000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAUBENSPECK, Bradley Wayne 5825 Caymus Loop Windermere, Florida 34786 / US | 02 /
GORSKY, Daniel Aaron 256 Countryside Dr. Lebanon, Ohio 45036 / US | 03 /
NORMAN, Craig Rolland 1015 Garden Crossing Lane Cumming, Georgia 30040 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19885792.2 | 11.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019US60675 | Priority number, date | US201862760218P | 13.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862760218 P | US201916674063 | 05.11.2019 Original published format: US201916674063 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020102050 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880568 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/32, B65D19/42 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
B65D19/0026 (EP);
B65D19/0071 (CN);
B65D19/0048 (US);
B62B3/008 (EP);
B62B3/16 (EP,US);
B62B5/0093 (EP,US);
B65D19/0012 (US);
B65D19/38 (CN,US);
B65D19/42 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00034 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00069 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00129 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00273 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00288 (EP);
B65D2519/00293 (CN);
B65D2519/00308 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00323 (EP);
B65D2519/00333 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00338 (US);
B65D2519/00402 (EP);
B65D2519/00407 (EP);
B65D2519/00412 (EP);
B65D2519/00437 (EP);
B65D2519/00442 (EP);
B65D2519/00567 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00756 (US);
B65D2519/00771 (EP);
B65D2519/00781 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00791 (EP);
B65D2519/00796 (EP);
B65D2519/00815 (EP,US);
B65D2519/0084 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00955 (US);
B65D2519/0096 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | B65D19/00, B65D19/24, B65D19/32, B65D19/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | HALBGROSSE KUNSTSTOFFPALETTE MIT DECKLOCHFLÄCHEN | [2021/38] | English: | HALF-SIZE PLASTIC PALLET WITH DECK SCOOP AREAS | [2021/38] | French: | PALETTE EN PLASTIQUE DE DEMI-TAILLE DOTÉE DE ZONES DE SOULÈVEMENT DE PLATEAU | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 13.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4316419 (CUPIDO ERNST P); | [Y]DE3909022 (STUCKI KUNSTSTOFFWERK [DE]); | [Y]ES1071497U (FERNANDEZ GUTIERREZ ANTON [ES]); | [Y]US2011126741 (SOSA BRAVO SERGIO [US]); | [Y]US2012037050 (NEVO SHLOMO [IL], et al); | [Y]WO2013122944 (CPI BINANI INC [US]); | [Y]EP2799358 (GREEN BOX S L [ES]); | [E]WO2019231881 (CHEP TECHNOLOGY PTY LTD [AU], et al) | International search | [A]US3424110 (TOOT WILLIAM W) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US3680495 (PIKE DANIEL W) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US5566624 (BROWN HENRY F [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US5769003 (ROSE HENRY H [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [A]US6386118 (BENDIT MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [X]US6976436 (SUGIHARA JUNRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * , entire document * |