EP3881188 - MANAGING FREE SPACE IN A COMPRESSED MEMORY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeropoint Technologies AB Falkenbergsgatan 3 412 85 Göteborg / SE | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVERTI, Chloe G. Mplessa 80, Papagou 15669 Attiki / GR | 02 /
ARELAKIS, Angelos Maj på Malös gata 36 417 67 Göteborg / SE | 03 /
NIKOLAKOPOULOS, Ioannis Gustavsbergsgatan 4 431 37 Mölndal / SE | 04 /
STENSTRÖM, Per Sjömarksvägen 2 423 61 Torslanda / SE | 05 /
PETERSEN MOURA TRANCOSO, Pedro Kvillegatan 3 lgh 1504 417 08 Göteborg / SE | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19885865.6 | 14.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019SE51156 | Priority number, date | SE20180051423 | 14.11.2018 Original published format: SE 1851423 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020101562 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881188 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3881188 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02, G06F9/46 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
G06F12/023 (EP);
G06F12/08 (EP,SE);
G06F3/0608 (US);
G06F12/0238 (US);
G06F12/0882 (US);
G06F3/0604 (US);
G06F3/0659 (US);
G06F3/0673 (US);
G06F2212/401 (EP,SE);
G06F9/46 (EP,SE)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | G06F12/08, G06F9/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON FREIEM PLATZ IN EINEM KOMPRIMIERTEN SPEICHERSYSTEM | [2021/38] | English: | MANAGING FREE SPACE IN A COMPRESSED MEMORY SYSTEM | [2021/38] | French: | GESTION D'ESPACE LIBRE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE MÉMOIRE COMPRESSÉE | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 10.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 21.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9941668 (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 6, line 8 - page 6, line 18; figures 1A, 2A ** page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 29 *; | [A] - CHOUKSE ESHA ET AL, "Compresso: Pragmatic Main Memory Compression", 2018 51ST ANNUAL IEEE/ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICROARCHITECTURE (MICRO), IEEE, (20181020), doi:10.1109/MICRO.2018.00051, pages 546 - 558, XP033473324 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MICRO.2018.00051 | International search | [A]US6681305 (FRANKE HUBERTUS [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * ; abstract; column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 52 *; | [A]US6968424 (DANILAK RADOSLAV [US]) [A] 1-26 * ; abstract; column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 5 *; | [A]US2008307188 (FRANASZEK PETER A [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0010]-[0011 ] *; | [A]US2014189281 (SOKOL JR JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-26* ; abstract; paragraphs [0006]-[0011] *; | [A]US2015242432 (BAK YEVGENIY M [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0085]-[0104]; figures 10,11 *; | [A]US2018088822 (ALAMELDEEN ALAA R [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0012]-[0014] *; | [XA] - E. CHOUKSE et al., "Compresso: Pragmatic Main Memory Compression", 2018 51 st Annual IEEE /ACM International Symposium on Microarchitecture (MICRO, Fukuoka, (20181020), doi:10.1109/MICRO.2018.00051, pages 546 - 558, XP033473324 [X] 1-11, 14-24 * ; whole document; abstract * [A] 12-13, 25-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MICRO.2018.00051 |