EP3880208 - KRAS G12C INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mirati Therapeutics, Inc. 3545 Cray Court San Diego, CA 92121 / US | For all designated states Array BioPharma Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/20] | For all designated states Mirati Therapeutics, Inc. 3545 Cray Court San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states Array Biopharma, Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | |||
Former [2021/38] | For all designated states Mirati Therapeutics, Inc. 9393 Towne Centre Drive Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states Array Biopharma, Inc. 3200 Walnut Street Boulder, CO 80301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARX, Matthew, Arnold c/o Mirati Therapetutics, Inc. 9393 Towne Centre Dr. Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
BOBINSKI, Thomas, P. 12588 Carmel Creeks Road 33 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
BURNS, Aaron, Craig 16954 Manresa Court San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 04 /
GAUDINO, John c/o Array BioPharma Inc. 3200 Walnut St. Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 05 /
HAAS, Julia c/o Array Biopharma Inc. 3200 Walnut St. Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 06 /
KETCHAM, John, Michael 7447 Baltic Street San Diego, CA 92111 / US | 07 /
LAWSON, John, David 6755 Xana Way Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 08 /
NEWHOUSE, Brad c/o Array Biopharma Inc. 3200 Walnut St. Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 09 /
PAJK, Spencer c/o Array Biopharma Inc. 3200 Walnut St. Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 10 /
SMITH, Christopher, Ronald 3316 Windbreak Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 11 /
TANG, Tony, P. c/o Array Biopharma, Inc. 3200 Walnut St. Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19886028.0 | 14.05.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019US32249 | Priority number, date | US201816191190 | 14.11.2018 Original published format: US201816191190 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020101736 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880208 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/519, C07D471/04, C07D519/00, A61P35/00, C07D491/08 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (IL,KR);
A61K31/5355 (IL,KR);
A61K31/5377 (IL,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D491/08 (EP,IL,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | A61K31/519, C07D471/04, C07D519/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | KRAS-G12C-INHIBITOREN | [2021/38] | English: | KRAS G12C INHIBITORS | [2021/38] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE KRAS G12C | [2021/38] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 14.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017201161 (MIRATI THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); | [E]WO2019099524 (MIRATI THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2016297774 (LI LIANSHENG [US], et al); | [Y]US2018072723 (BLAKE JAMES F [US], et al); | [AE]US2019144444 (BLAKE JAMES F [US], et al) |