EP3895745 - INTELLIGENT INTRACRANIAL HEMATOMA REMOVAL AND DRAINAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Wantefu Medical Apparatus Co., Ltd No. 1 Renhe Road Machikou Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Wenjie No. 1 Renhe Road Machikou Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 02 /
CUI, Shaofei No. 1 Renhe Road Machikou Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 03 /
TANG, Zhouping No. 1 Renhe Road Machikou Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Shirun No. 1 Renhe Road Machikou Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 05 /
LI, Yuanwei No. 1 Renhe Road Machikou Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 06 /
WU, Guofeng No. 1 Renhe Road Machikou Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 07 /
YANG, Qingwu No. 1 Renhe Road Machikou Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 08 /
ZHAO, Zhizeng No. 1 Renhe Road Machikou Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | 09 /
LI, Yu No. 1 Renhe Road Machikou Changping District Beijing 102200 / CN | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Cleanthous, Marinos 4 Prometheus Street, 3 Floor 1065 Nicosia / CY | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | Sach, Greg Robert C/o KA Filing (EU) Limited Siedlungsstr. 4a 85253 Erdweg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19888264.9 | 11.10.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019CN110566 | Priority number, date | CN201811430652 | 28.11.2018 Original published format: CN201811430652 | [2021/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020108112 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895745 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61B5/03, A61B1/00, A61B1/015, A61B1/07, G16H20/40, G16H30/40 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
A61M1/77 (EP);
G16H20/17 (US);
A61B1/00004 (EP,CN);
A61B1/00165 (EP,CN);
A61B1/015 (EP,CN);
A61B1/07 (EP,CN);
A61B5/031 (EP);
A61M1/73 (EP);
A61M1/74 (EP,US);
A61M1/774 (US);
A61M5/158 (US);
G16H20/40 (EP);
G16H30/40 (EP);
A61M1/70 (EP);
A61M2202/0413 (US);
A61M2205/18 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3313 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP);
A61M2205/3344 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3553 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3584 (EP);
A61M2205/50 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP);
A61M2210/0693 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | A61M1/00, A61B5/03 | ||
Former IPC [2021/42] | A61M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES SYSTEM ZUR ENTFERNUNG UND DRAINAGE INTRAKRANIELLER HÄMATOME | [2021/42] | English: | INTELLIGENT INTRACRANIAL HEMATOMA REMOVAL AND DRAINAGE SYSTEM | [2021/42] | French: | SYSTÈME INTELLIGENT D'ÉLIMINATION ET DE DRAINAGE D'HÉMATOME INTRACRÂNIEN | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2021 | Translation filed | 29.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/42] | 29.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 12.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2021/42] | 18.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 09.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 09.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 09.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 09.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2021 | Decision despatched | 09.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018035366 (REBOUND THERAPEUTICS CORP [US]); | [A]CN108853618 (SUZHOU NUOLAINING MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) |