EP3851593 - TELEOPERATION DEVICE FOR CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NODA, Daisuke c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. Hiroshima Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 02 /
YAMASHITA, Koji c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. Hiroshima Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | 03 /
YAMAZAKI, Yoichiro c/o KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. Hiroshima Head Office 2-1, Itsukaichikou 2-chome, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5161 / JP | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19888518.8 | 01.11.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019JP43083 | Priority number, date | JP20180224603 | 30.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018224603 | [2021/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020110605 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851593 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3851593 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/20, G08C17/02, H04Q9/00 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
G08C17/02 (EP);
E02F9/205 (EP,US);
E02F9/264 (US);
G05D1/0038 (US);
G05D1/005 (US);
G05D1/224 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | E02F9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TELEBETRIEBSVORRICHTUNG FÜR BAUMASCHINEN | [2023/19] | English: | TELEOPERATION DEVICE FOR CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY | [2021/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TÉLÉOPÉRATION POUR UNE MACHINERIE DE CONSTRUCTION | [2021/29] |
Former [2021/29] | TELEBETRIEBVORRICHTUNG FÜR BAUMASCHINEN | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2021 | Translation filed | 14.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 06.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001173022 (TAKAHASHIWORKS CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0030]-[0096], fig. 1-20 *; | [A]JP2003278159 (PORT & AIRPORT RES INST, et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0014]-[0099], fig. 1-10 *; | [A]JP2018142123 (IHI CORP) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0020]-[0085], fig. 1-9 * | by applicant | JPH09217382 | JP2013168777 |