EP3888906 - ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO Co., Ltd 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | For all designated states POSCO Co., Ltd 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu, Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | ||
Former [2022/47] | For all designated states POSCO Holdings Inc. 440, Teheran-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06194 / KR | ||
Former [2021/40] | For all designated states POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HA, Bongwoo Goedong-dong) 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jung-Woo Goedong-dong) 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 03 /
NO, Taeyoung Goedong-dong) 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Dong-Gyu Goedong-dong) 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19888551.9 | 26.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019KR16387 | Priority number, date | KR20180153083 | 30.11.2018 Original published format: KR 20180153083 | [2021/40] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020111742 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3888906 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/12, B32B1/00, B32B15/01, B32B15/18 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
C09J175/04 (EP,KR);
B32B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
C09J5/04 (US);
B32B1/00 (EP);
B32B15/011 (KR,US);
B32B15/043 (EP);
B32B15/18 (EP,KR);
B32B37/06 (KR);
B32B37/12 (KR,US);
C09J11/06 (KR);
C09J125/00 (EP,KR);
C09J133/00 (KR);
C09J161/04 (EP,KR);
C09J163/00 (EP,KR);
C09J167/00 (KR);
C09J7/28 (EP,US);
H01F1/147 (US);
H01F1/16 (KR);
H01F1/18 (EP);
H01F41/02 (US);
H01F41/0233 (EP,KR);
B32B2255/06 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2307/202 (EP);
B32B2307/208 (EP,KR);
B32B2307/536 (EP);
B32B2307/584 (EP);
B32B2457/00 (EP);
C09J2301/1242 (EP,US);
C09J2301/314 (EP);
C09J2400/163 (EP);
C09J2400/166 (US);
C09J2423/04 (US);
C09J2425/00 (US);
C09J2433/00 (US);
C09J2461/00 (US);
C09J2463/00 (US);
C09J2467/00 (US);
C09J2475/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | B32B7/12, B32B15/18, B32B15/01, B32B37/12, B32B37/06, H01F1/16, H01F41/02, C09J163/00, C09J133/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | ELEKTROSTAHLBLECH UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/40] | English: | ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2021/40] | French: | TÔLE EN ACIER ÉLECTRIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2021 | Translation filed | 24.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 29.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000030923 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JP2000336487 (NIPPON KOKAN KK, et al); | [A]JP3196564B ; | [A]JP3486962B ; | [A]JP6086098B |