EP3817773 - HUMANIZED ANTIBODIES AGAINST C-KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forty Seven, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jie 3119 Stockton Place Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
SOMPALLI, Kavitha 12310 Main Campus Drive Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2024/30] |
Former [2021/19] | Chapman, Desmond Mark Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19890096.1 | 25.11.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019US63091 | Priority number, date | US201862771526P | 26.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862771526 P | [2021/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020112687 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3817773 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3817773 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/40, A61K39/395 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
C07K2317/24 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/732 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,IL,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/19] | A61K39/395, C07K16/18, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HUMANISIERTE ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN C-KIT | [2021/19] | English: | HUMANIZED ANTIBODIES AGAINST C-KIT | [2021/19] | French: | ANTICORPS HUMANISÉS DIRIGÉS CONTRE C-KIT | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 24.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007253951 (NG GORDON [US], et al); | [I]WO2014018625 (KOLLTAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) | International search | [A]US2012253017 (BALLARD VICTORIA [US], et al); | [A]US8552157 (AMATULLI MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US8791249 (NG GORDON [CA], et al); | [A]US2017081421 (HARMS BRIAN [US], et al); | [A]US9932419 (LA FLEUR EDWARD [US], et al) | by applicant | US5194594 | US5225539 | US5304489 | US5530101 | US5585089 | US5624821 | US5741957 | US5786464 | US5834597 | US5849992 | US5859205 | US5888809 | US6063598 | US6114148 | US6407213 | US6624821 | WO2004050884 | WO2005019442 | US6881557 | US2007253951 | WO2008012142 | WO2008067115 | WO2008107388 | WO2009027471 | US7569339 | US7915391 | WO2014018625 | WO2016033201 |