EP3888945 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | [2024/34] |
Former [2023/46] | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa Prefecture, 254-8601 / JP | ||
Former [2021/40] | For all designated states The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. 36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8685 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAYASU, Masaaki c/o The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd., Hiratsuka Factory, 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19890149.8 | 10.10.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019JP39963 | Priority number, date | JP20180220261 | 26.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018220261 | [2021/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020110474 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3888945 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3888945 | Date: | 23.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/03, B60C11/12 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
B60C11/0304 (EP);
B60C11/1218 (EP,US);
B60C11/0306 (EP);
B60C11/12 (RU);
B60C11/1236 (EP,US);
B60C2011/0383 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN | [2021/40] | English: | PNEUMATIC TIRE | [2021/40] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2021 | Translation filed | 12.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 31.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2005041339 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figure -; table 1 * [A] 4; | [XA]JP2005162197 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract; figures 2,5,6 * [A] 4; | [X]JP2005205988 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract; figures 1,3,4 *; | [XA]JP2006082632 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figures 1-3 * [A] 4; | [XA]JP2012041024 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figures 1,2,7a,7b * [A] 4; | [X]JP2013136366 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-6 * figures 1,2,7 *; | [XA]US2015041034 (MATSUSHITA KOHTARO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0062]; figures 1-5 * [A] 4; | [X]JP2016168966 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1-6 * figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]US2017129287 (SATOI AYA [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0092]; figure 9; table 1 *; | [X]US2017305201 (AKASHI YASUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1-6* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0091]; figures 2-4 * | International search | [A]JPS494511B (THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.) [A] 1-6 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0524044 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [A] 1-6 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0631832 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-6 * , entire text, all drawings & EP 579436 A1 & FI 933026 A & CA 2099890 A *; | [A]EP0864448 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * , entire text, all drawings & DE 19710400 A & AT 257776 T & DK 864448 T *; | [A]JP2001150446 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [A] 1-6 * entire text all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2002292640 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-6 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2002316328 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [A] 1-6 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009255734 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013252690 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [A] 1-6 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2013/0328240 A1, entire text, all drawings & EP 2671710 A1 & CN 103481410 A *; | [A]US2014265033 (WOLOSZYN THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-6* , entire text, all drawings & EP 2777922 A1 & CN 104044230 A * | by applicant | JPS494511B | JP4411975B |