EP3821266 - VEHICLE RANGE ESTIMATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins, Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOOKS, Martin T. 208 19th Street Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | 02 /
BOOTH, Richard A. 3432 Grove Place Columbus, Indiana 47203 / US | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | CSY London Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | CSY London 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 19890660.4 | 27.11.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019US63760 | Priority number, date | US201862773691P | 30.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862773691 P | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020113107 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821266 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36, B60L3/00, B60W10/06, B60W10/08 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
B60L3/0046 (EP);
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
B60K6/46 (US);
B60L3/12 (EP);
B60W10/06 (EP);
B60W10/08 (EP);
G01R31/382 (US);
B60L2260/52 (EP,US);
B60L2260/54 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGREICHWEITENSCHÄTZER | [2021/20] | English: | VEHICLE RANGE ESTIMATOR | [2021/20] | French: | ESTIMATEUR D'AUTONOMIE DE VÉHICULE | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 22.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010131139 (SAKAI TADASHI [JP], et al); | [I]US2014324370 (UNDERHILL TYLER [US], et al); | [A]US2015276420 (MCGEE RYAN ABRAHAM [CN], et al); | [I]US2016375786 (LIU ALBERT [US]); | [I]WO2017134471 (TEVVA MOTORS LTD [GB]) | International search | [Y]US2010131139 (SAKAI TADASHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2013041538 (JIN ZHIHONG H [US], et al); | [A]US2014121956 (JASTRZEBSKI MARK [US]); | [Y]US2014324370 (UNDERHILL TYLER [US], et al); | [Y]US2015276420 (MCGEE RYAN ABRAHAM [CN], et al); | [A]US2018029500 (KATANODA TOMOYA [JP]) |