EP3889081 - MEDIUM CONVEYANCE DEVICE, IMAGE READING DEVICE, AND CONVEYANCE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA Hidetoshi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 19890667.9 | 09.09.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019JP35391 | Priority number, date | JP20180224995 | 30.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018224995 | [2021/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020110412 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3889081 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65H7/06, G03G15/00, B65H5/06, B65H7/14, B65H3/06 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
B65H7/14 (EP,US);
B65H7/06 (EP,CN);
B65H3/06 (EP);
B65H3/063 (US);
B65H5/06 (EP);
B65H7/08 (US);
B65H7/10 (US);
B65H7/18 (US);
G03G15/00 (CN);
G03G15/602 (EP);
G03G15/607 (EP);
B65H2511/20 (EP);
B65H2511/52 (EP);
B65H2513/10 (EP,US);
B65H2513/40 (EP,US);
B65H2553/42 (EP);
B65H2701/1131 (CN);
B65H2801/03 (CN);
B65H2801/39 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | B65H7/06, G03G15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | MEDIUMFÖRDERVORRICHTUNG, BILDLESEVORRICHTUNG UND FÖRDERSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/40] | English: | MEDIUM CONVEYANCE DEVICE, IMAGE READING DEVICE, AND CONVEYANCE CONTROL METHOD | [2021/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT DE SUPPORT, DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE D'IMAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE TRANSPORT | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2021 | Translation filed | 30.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 28.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP2003205654 (BROTHER IND LTD) [YD] 3-6* the whole document *; | [IAY]US2010098471 (SATOH OSAMU [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document * [A] 7,10 [Y] 3-6; | [Y]US2018179006 (KOGI SHINSUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 3-6 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2005041623 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-11* , & US 2005/0019075 A1 *; | [XY]JP2010116214 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-2, 8 * , paragraphs [0005], [0054]-[0111], fig. 1-36 & US 2010/0098471 A1, paragraphs [0007], [0095]-[0155], fig. 1-36 * [Y] 3-11; | [A]JP2014106221 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-11 * , & US 2014/0152734 A1 *; | [A]JP2016212422 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2018135208 (CANON DENSHI KK) [Y] 3-11 * , paragraphs [0053]-[0058], [0115], fig. 1-5, 20 (c) (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2003205654 |