EP3887937 - TECHNIQUES FOR IMPROVING SECURITY OF ENCRYPTED VEHICLE SOFTWARE UPDATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paccar Inc 777 106th Avenue NE Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUGER, David R. c/o Paccar Inc. 777 106th Avenue N.E. Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Calysta NV Lambroekstraat 5a 1831 Diegem / BE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19891304.8 | 29.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019US63884 | Priority number, date | US201816206678 | 30.11.2018 Original published format: US201816206678 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020113189 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887937 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/65, G06F21/12 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
G06F8/65 (EP,US);
H04L63/0435 (EP,US);
G06F21/572 (EP);
G06F21/606 (EP);
H04L63/061 (EP);
H04L9/0841 (EP,US);
H04L9/0863 (EP);
H04L9/0866 (EP,US);
H04L9/0869 (EP);
H04L9/30 (US);
H04L9/3234 (EP,US);
H04L9/3268 (US);
H04W12/03 (EP,US);
H04W12/041 (EP);
H04W12/35 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | G06F8/65, G06F9/445, G06F21/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER SICHERHEIT VON VERSCHLÜSSELTEN FAHRZEUGSOFTWAREAKTUALISIERUNGEN | [2021/40] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR IMPROVING SECURITY OF ENCRYPTED VEHICLE SOFTWARE UPDATES | [2021/40] | French: | TECHNIQUES D'AMÉLIORATION DE SÉCURITÉ DE MISES À JOUR DE LOGICIEL DE VÉHICULE CHIFFRÉES | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2010128878 (LEE KYUNG KEUN [KR], et al) [Y] 20 * , paragraphs 0010 [0067], [0080] *; | [Y]US2015237502 (SCHMIDT ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 6, 12, 13, 15-19 * , paragraphs [0105], [0302], [0303], [0310], [0339], [0340], [0345], [0346], [0349], [0352] *; | [A]US2017180391 (HINCHLIFFE ALEXANDER J [US], et al)[A] 1-20; | [Y]US2017295016 (REVELL ELISE [SE]) [Y] 2-20 * , paragraphs [0019], [0022], [0045], [0050], [0087], [0088], [0092], [0094], [0096], [0100], [0102], [0110]-[0112], [0147], [0153], [0154], [0167], [0178] *; | [XY]US2018217828 (MADRID DANIEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0001], [0003]-[0005], [0008], [0014], [0016], [0017], [0020], [0022], [0024], [0026]-[0033], [0035], [0039], [0040], [0047], [0053] * [Y] 2-20 | by applicant | US2017295016 | US2018217828 |