EP3887608 - A WATER RECIRCULATION SYSTEM INTENDED FOR RECYCLING OF WATER OR DISCARDING OF WATER NOT SUITABLE TO RECYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orbital Systems AB Hans Michelsensgatan 10A 211 20 Malmö / SE | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÖBRINK, Mårten Ynglingagatan 8 217 74 Malmö / SE | 02 /
RIDELL, Michael Ringdansvägen 53 245 42 Staffanstorp / SE | [2023/10] |
Former [2021/40] | 01 /
ÖBRINK, Mårten Ynglingagatan 8 217 74 MALMÖ / SE | ||
02 /
RIDELL, Michael Ringdansvägen 53 245 42 STAFFANSTORP / SE | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 19891371.7 | 14.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019SE51151 | Priority number, date | SE20180051478 | 28.11.2018 Original published format: SE 1851478 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020112001 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887608 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04, A47K3/28, E03B1/04, E03C1/00, E03C1/044, F24D17/00, F24D19/10 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
E03C1/044 (EP,US);
E03C1/0408 (EP,US);
E03B1/041 (EP);
E03C1/00 (EP);
F24D17/0005 (EP,US);
F24D17/0078 (EP,US);
F24D17/0089 (EP,US);
F24D19/1051 (EP,US);
E03B2001/045 (EP);
E03C2001/005 (EP);
E03C2201/40 (EP,US);
Y02A20/30 (EP);
Y02B30/18 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | E03C1/04, A47K3/28, E03B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | WASSERKREISLAUFSYSTEM ZUM RECYCLING VON WASSER ODER ZUM ENTSORGEN VON NICHT RECYCELBAREM WASSER | [2021/40] | English: | A WATER RECIRCULATION SYSTEM INTENDED FOR RECYCLING OF WATER OR DISCARDING OF WATER NOT SUITABLE TO RECYCLE | [2021/40] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RECIRCULATION D'EAU PRÉVU POUR RECYCLER DE L'EAU OU POUR REJETER DE L'EAU NON APPROPRIÉE AU RECYCLAGE | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 31.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009134080 (FABIG MARCUS JOHN [AU]); | [Y]WO2011157426 (GILBERT PATRICK [GB]); | [Y]WO2013095278 (ORBITAL SYSTEMS AB [SE]) | International search | [A]US2008196156 (BREWIN PETER [GB]); | [YA]GB2497264 (LEE MARK [GB]); | [A]US2013199627 (GILBERT PATRICK [IT]); | [YA]US2014033422 (CHRISTY NICHOLAS [AU]); | [YA]WO2017099663 (ORBITAL SYSTEMS AB [SE]); | [A]WO2018097790 (ORBITAL SYSTEMS AB [SE]) |