EP3876072 - SLIDING CORRECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SLIDING COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHONG, Peng No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
ZHENG, Jianrong No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19891640.5 | 11.09.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019CN105423 | Priority number, date | CN201811457561 | 30.11.2018 Original published format: CN201811457561 | [2021/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020108006 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876072 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G06F11/16, H04M1/02 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
H04M1/0264 (EP,US);
G06F1/1624 (EP,KR);
G06F1/1686 (EP,CN,KR);
G05D3/20 (US);
G06F11/1658 (CN,KR);
H04M1/0235 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | G06F1/16, G06F11/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | GLEITKORREKTURVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR GLEITKOMPONENTE | [2021/36] | English: | SLIDING CORRECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SLIDING COMPONENT | [2021/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CORRECTION DE COULISSEMENT POUR COMPOSANT COULISSANT | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2021 | Translation filed | 04.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 17.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN108833623 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN108897375 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-5 ** the whole document * |