EP3890746 - VITAMIN D MICRO-EMULSIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lipicare Life Sciences Ltd. Kiryat Atidim Building 7, Entrance 1, 2nd Floor 6158101 Tel Aviv / IL | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EZRA, Rafael 21 Bavli St. 6233121 Tel-aviv / IL | 02 /
MANOR, Yoni 29 Ruth St. 34404 Haifa / IL | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Grellingerstrasse 60 4052 Basel / CH | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19892028.2 | 06.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019IB01314 | Priority number, date | US201862776022P | 06.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862776022 P | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020115552 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3890746 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/593, A61K9/107, A61K9/127, C07F9/10 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/59 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/24 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,KR,US);
A61P27/02 (EP,KR);
A61P27/06 (KR);
B82Y5/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | VITAMIN-D-MIKROEMULSIONEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2021/41] | English: | VITAMIN D MICRO-EMULSIONS AND USES THEREOF | [2021/41] | French: | MICRO-ÉMULSIONS DE VITAMINE D ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9401089 (DIANORM GERAETE G MAIERHOFER [DE], et al); | [Y]DE19519273 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [Y]WO9718817 (KITA KIYOSHI [JP]); | [X]CN105535021 (DRUG & INSTR INSPECTION INST MINI OF HEALTH P L A THE GENERAL LOGISTICS DEPT); | International search | US2005026877 [y] (CHEN ANDREW X [US], et al) [y] 1-10,18-20; | US2011015266 [a] (HANEFELD ANDREA [DE], et al)[a] 1-10,18-20; | US2011136912 [y] (KETELSON HOWARD ALLEN [US], et al) [y] 1-10,18-20; | US2018008538 [a] (IZQUIERDO TORRES FRANCISCA [ES], et al) [a] 1-10,18-20; | WO2018209293 [a] (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [a] 1-10,18-20; | [yY] - FAHIM M. M. et al., "Fluorophotometry as a diagnostic tool for the evaluation of dry eye disease", BMC Ophthalmology, vol. 6, doi:10.1186/1471-2415-6-20, XP021016328 [y] 19,20/19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2415-6-20 | [aA] - ORLOVA T., "Possible use of provitamin D3 photoisomerization for spectral dosimetryof bioactive antirachitic UV radiation", Journal of Applied Spectroscopy, (2009), vol. 76, no. 2, doi: 10.1007/s10812-009-9159-1 , pages 240 - 244, XP55751257 [a] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10812-009-9159-1 | by applicant | WO9401089 | DE19519273 | WO9718817 | US2005026877 | US7723287 | US2011136912 | CN105535021 | - GILBARD et al., J. Inv. Ophthal. Vis. Sci., (19870000), vol. 28, pages 225 - 228 |