EP3892343 - INPUT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Masaho c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Kazuyuki c/o Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19892364.1 | 29.11.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019JP46912 | Priority number, date | JP20180230242 | 07.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018230242 | [2021/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020116357 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892343 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/214, A63F13/24, G06F3/0354, G06F3/041 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
G06F3/03547 (EP,US);
A63F13/24 (EP,US);
A63F13/214 (EP);
A63F13/28 (EP);
G06F3/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | EINGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/41] | English: | INPUT DEVICE | [2021/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRÉE | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2021 | Translation filed | 26.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 01.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016224173 (NAKAZAWA SHUNSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1A-5 * [I] 1-14; | [A]US2018314406 (POWDERLY JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraph [0181] - paragraph [0212]; figures 1-15 * | International search | [Y]JP2015072540 (LENOVO SINGAPORE PTE LTD) [Y] 8-11; | [Y]JP2016110775 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD)[Y] 12-14; | [XY]US2018314406 (POWDERLY JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1-7 [Y] 8-14 | by applicant | US2015290534 |