EP3890608 - NEEDLES FOR MEASUREMENT OF BODY FLUID ANALYTES SUCH AS GLUCOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laxmi Therapeutic Devices, Inc. 75 Aero Camino Suite 204 Goleta, CA 93117 / US | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENNATHUR, Sumita 5785 Maley Drive Goleta, CA 93117 / US | 02 /
HALPIN, Michelle, Carrie 1723 Robbins Street Santa Barbara, CA 93101 / US | 03 /
PEIK, Landon, Christopher 409 West Islay, Apt. A Santa Barbara, CA 93101 / US | 04 /
BEER, Leanne 37 Venus Street San Farancisco, CA 94124 / US | 05 /
VAN ANTWERP, Bill 26833 Pinehurst Drive Valencla, CA 91355 / US | 06 /
ROFEH, Justin, Daniel 431 S. Doheny Dr. Beverly Hills, CA 93101 / US | 07 /
BODEN, Seth 63 Sontag Pl., Unit 208 Goleta, CA 93117 / US | 08 /
THEOGARAJAN, Luke Satish, Kumar 7185 Tuolumne Drive Goleta, CA 93117 / US | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19892785.7 | 03.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019US64215 | Priority number, date | US201862774505P | 03.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862774505 P | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020117788 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3890608 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, A61B5/1468 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
A61B5/14503 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/1468 (EP);
A61B5/685 (EP,US);
A61B2562/125 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | A61B5/145 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | NADELN ZUR MESSUNG VON KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEITSANALYTEN WIE GLUCOSE | [2021/41] | English: | NEEDLES FOR MEASUREMENT OF BODY FLUID ANALYTES SUCH AS GLUCOSE | [2021/41] | French: | AIGUILLES PERMETTANT LA MESURE D'ANALYTES DE FLUIDES CORPORELS TELS QUE LE GLUCOSE | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011218490 (OCVIRK GREGOR [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0032] - [0035]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2016235346 (LIU ZENGHE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0036] , [0037]; figures 1A,1B,4A-4C,5,6; claims 4,5 *; | [X]WO2018065954 (DEBIOTECH SA [CH]) [X] 1-15 * page 13, line 7 - page 15, line 3; figures 1c,2,6,7,8A,10B *; | [X] - VASYLIEVA NATALIA ET AL, "Silicon/SU8 multi-electrode micro-needle forin vivoneurochemical monitoring", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, UK, AMSTERDAM , NL, (20150506), vol. 72, doi:10.1016/J.BIOS.2015.05.004, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 148 - 155, XP029613455 [X] 1-15 * Section 2. Materials and methods;; figures 1A, 2, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2015.05.004 | International search | [A]US4671288 (GOUGH DAVID A [US]) [A] 1-8a* ; entire document. *; | [A]US2010130886 (KANETO MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8a * ; entire document. *; | [A]US2010331729 (NAITO TOSHIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8a * ; entire document. *; | [X]US2011071377 (KANETO MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8a * ; entire document, especially para [0055]-[0075], [0097]-[0098], [0134], and Fig. 2-3. *; | [A]US2014142405 (BRISTER MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-8a * ; entire document. *; | [A]US2017181672 (NOGUEIRA KEITH [US], et al) [A] 1-8a * ; entire document. * |