EP3849176 - GPS COORDINATES-BASED TARGET OVERALL PLANNING METHOD AND CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Hikvision Digital Technology Co., Ltd. No.555 Qianmo Road Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yong No.555 Qianmo Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 02 /
JIN, Haishan No.555 Qianmo Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Wei No.555 Qianmo Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 19892928.3 | 18.11.2019 | [2021/28] | WO2019CN119244 | Priority number, date | CN201811485122 | 06.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811485122 | [2021/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020114232 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3849176 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18, G06T7/20, G06M1/27 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
H04N7/181 (EP,CN,US);
G01S19/24 (CN);
H04N23/698 (US);
G06T7/246 (EP);
G08B13/19608 (EP);
G08B13/19645 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] | Title | German: | GPS-KOORDINATENBASIERTES ZIELGESAMTPLANUNGSVERFAHREN UND KAMERA | [2021/28] | English: | GPS COORDINATES-BASED TARGET OVERALL PLANNING METHOD AND CAMERA | [2021/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PLANIFICATION GLOBALE DE CIBLES SUR LA BASE DE COORDONNÉES GPS ET CAMÉRA | [2021/28] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2021 | Translation filed | 08.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN106708955 (ZHEJIANG UNIVIEW TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP3270585 (HANGZHOU HIKVISION DIGITAL TEC [CN]) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** figure 1 *; | [X]US2018211116 (MODI SOHRAB [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0035] - [0058] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0073] * |