EP3890593 - RESCUE BREATHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Cincinnati 2900 Reading Road, Suite 460 Cincinnati, OH 45206 / US | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENOIT, Justin 1246 Herschel Woods Lane Cincinnati, Ohio 45208 / US | 02 /
GUTMARK, Ephraim 5055 Rollman Estates Dr. Cincinnati, Ohio 45236 / US | 03 /
MCMULLAN, Jason 4225 Langley Ave. Cincinnati, Ohio 45217 / US | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Moore, Michael Richard Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19893370.7 | 06.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019US64843 | Priority number, date | US201862776657P | 07.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862776657 P | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020118138 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3890593 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/08, A61B5/097, A61M16/00, A61M16/06, A61M16/08, A61B5/091, A61B5/083, A61B5/087 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
A61M16/0084 (EP,US);
A61B5/0816 (EP);
A61B5/0836 (EP);
A61B5/087 (EP);
A61B5/091 (EP);
A61B5/097 (EP);
A61B5/4836 (EP);
A61B5/6803 (EP);
A61B5/742 (EP);
A61H31/00 (EP);
A61H31/005 (EP);
A61M16/0078 (US);
A61M16/0093 (US);
A61M16/024 (EP,US);
A61M16/06 (EP,US);
A61M16/085 (EP);
A61B5/7282 (EP);
A61H2201/0103 (EP);
A61H2201/5007 (EP);
A61H2201/5043 (EP);
A61H2201/5048 (EP);
A61H2201/5071 (EP);
A61H2230/405 (EP);
A61H2230/425 (EP);
A61M16/208 (EP);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0036 (EP,US);
A61M2205/05 (US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP);
A61M2205/3334 (US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP);
A61M2205/3592 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M2205/582 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (EP,US);
A61M2205/75 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8206 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | A61B5/00, A61B5/08, A61B5/097, A61M16/00, A61M16/06, A61M16/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | RETTUNGSBEATMUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/41] | English: | RESCUE BREATHING DEVICE | [2021/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF RESPIRATOIRE DE SAUVETAGE | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 27.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2707068 (ZOLL MEDICAL CORP [US]); | [XI]US2015096559 (DUVAL-ARNOULD JORDAN [US], et al); | [XI]US2015283342 (MIELCARZ CRAIG [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2003105407 (PEARCE EDWIN M [US], et al) [Y] 20 * entire document, especially para [0070], [0072], [0010] *; | [Y]US2007261698 (PALATNIK EUGENE [US]) [Y] 19 * entire document, especially para [0015], [0018], [0047], [0019-0020] *; | [Y]US2008092898 (SCHNEIDER HARTMUT [US], et al) [Y] 18 * entire document, especially para [0026], [0065], [0077] *; | [YA]US2015096559 (DUVAL-ARNOULD JORDAN [US], et al) [Y] 25, 26, 28-30 * entire document, especially para [0002], [0005], [0016-0017], [0019-0021], [0024], [0031], [0026], [0028] * [A] 27; | [Y]US2015238722 (AL-ALI AMMAR [US]) [Y] 22 * entire document, especially para [0037], [0032], [0009] *; | [XYA]US2015283342 (MIELCARZ CRAIG [US], et al) [X] 1-7, 13, 17, 21, 23, 24 * entire document, especially para [0003-0004], [0032-0033], [0026-0027], [0012] * [Y] 8, 16, 18-20, 22, 25, 26, 28-30 [A] 9-12, 14, 15, 27; | [YA]US2016206839 (FREEMAN GARY A [US], et al) [Y] 28 * entire document, especially para [0042], [0092] * [A] 9-12; | [Y]US2016213867 (ROBINSON SCOTT WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 29 * entire document, especially para [0026], [0029], [0005], [0007] *; | [A]US2017172844 (CENTEN COREY [CA]) [A] 9-12, 14, 15, 27* entire document *; | [Y]WO2018083634 (MEDSIMLAB LDA [PT]) [Y] 16 * entire document, especially para [0054], [0004], [0015] *; | [A]US2018160970 (KHOURY ABDO [FR], et al) [A] 9-12, 14, 15, 27 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018272084 (REINER STEVEN C [US]) [Y] 8 * entire document, especially para [0060], [0065], [0003], [0005], [0007] * | by applicant | EP2707068 | US2015096559 | US2015283342 |